Minnesota District Court
Judge:Katherine M Menendez
Referred: Leo I Brisbois
Case #: 0:25-cv-00638
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Terminated:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 4:59 AM CDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Plaintiff
LeaAnn Lyon
Represented By
Genevieve M Zimmerman
Meshbesher & Spence
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
7 7 notice Clerk's Notice of Case Opened in Other District Mon 03/10 8:19 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE:Case transferred from Minnesota has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:25-cv-02321, filed 03/06/2025. (kt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
6 6 notice Clerk's Notice of Case Transferred Out Tue 03/04 10:03 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of California. (kt)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Certified Copy of MDL (JPML) Panel Order Tue 03/04 10:02 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-504) transferring case to the Northern District of California per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria.(kt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
4 4 notice Clerk's Notice to JPML re Potentially Related Case Tue 02/18 5:41 PM
Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL 16-2741 re:1 Complaint. (MMP)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 02/18 5:40 PM
Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (MMP)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Tue 02/18 5:39 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 6th Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 25-cv-638 (KMM/LIB). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP)
Related: [-]
1 1 50 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/18 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11684864) filed by LeaAnn Lyon. Filer requests summons issued. (Zimmerman, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet