Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Linda V Parker
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:25-cv-10470
Nature of Suit462 Immigration - Naturalization Application
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 6:38 AM EDT
Petitioner
Rema Hegazy
for M.T., a Minor 13 Dunlap Circle
Oxford, MI 48371
Petitioner
M.T.
Respondent
USCIS Office of the Chief Counsel
Respondent
USCIS Officers


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
10 10 misc Letter Mon 04/07 3:51 PM
Document from Rema Hegazy (JPar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
9 9 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/21 12:59 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Defendant on 3/17/2025.. (MSyl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
8 8 service Acknowledgment Wed 03/12 4:18 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents for USCIS Office of the Chief Counsel, USCIS Officers. Documents mailed by USMS on 03/12/2025. (THum)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued* Tue 03/04 8:41 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *USCIS Office of the Chief Counsel, Attorney General, and U.S. Attorney*. (CShr)
Related: [-]
service Service Documents Received Tue 03/04 3:53 PM
Service Documents Received (JPar)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
6 6 order Directing Service by the US Marshal Mon 02/24 9:16 AM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Mon 02/24 9:16 AM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 02/24 9:17 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re6 Directing Service by the US Marshal,5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs mailed to: Rema Hegazy at 13 Dunlap Circle Oxford, MI 48371 (AFla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Thu 02/20 10:21 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MCho)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Wed 02/19 3:58 PM
APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Rema Hegazy. (DPer)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 02/19 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Rema Hegazy against USCIS Office of the Chief Counsel, USCIS Officers (DPer)
Related: [-]