Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Mark Pittman
Referred: Jeffrey L Cureton
Case #: 4:25-cv-00168
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Case in other court:352nd District Court, Tarrant County, Texas, 352-360973-25
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 5:07 AM CDT
Defendant
Ventura Foods, LLC
Represented By
Kevin Elder Barnett
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Katrin U Schatz
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Ellis
8539 Melissa Drive
White Settlement, TX 76108
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Marivi Rodriguez
Terminated: 02/24/2025
Defendant
Kimberly Sanford
Terminated: 02/24/2025
Defendant
Spencer Williams
Terminated: 02/24/2025


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Fri 04/25 4:37 PM
Order Accepting Findings and Recommendations re:18 Findings and Recommendations on Case re:10 Motion to Remand is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/25/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
19 19 8 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Wed 04/09 3:28 PM
ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN: The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed Joint Status Report within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/9/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Findings and Recommendations Wed 04/09 3:13 PM
Findings and Recommendations on Case re:10 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Eric Ellis. Objections to F&R due by 4/23/2025. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/9/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
17 17 order Order on Motion for Discovery Tue 04/08 2:50 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying14 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery and Inspection of Evidence for the reasons stated in Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery and Inspection of Evidence16 . (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/8/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
16 16 respm Response/Objection Wed 03/26 3:05 PM
RESPONSE filed by Ventura Foods, LLC re:14 MOTION for Discovery (Schatz, Katrin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
15 15 respm Response/Objection Mon 03/17 4:07 PM
RESPONSE filed by Ventura Foods, LLC re:10 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Schatz, Katrin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
14 14 motion Discovery Tue 03/11 6:05 PM
MOTION for Discovery filed by Eric Ellis with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Ellis, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/10 11:19 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Ventura Foods, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Schatz, Katrin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 03/03 9:37 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting11 Defendant Ventura Foods, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Ventura Foods, LLC's answer or other responsive pleading is due no later than 3/10/2025. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 3/3/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
utility Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Optional) Mon 03/03 1:29 PM
Deadline Modification Per Order 12 : answer or other responsive pleading is due no later than 3/10/2025 (wxc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 02/28 6:22 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Ventura Foods, LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Schatz, Katrin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
10 10 motion Remand to State Court Wed 02/26 4:03 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Eric Ellis with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Ellis, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Unfiling Pleading Mon 02/24 4:54 PM
Order Unfiling3 ,4 ,5 due to the following deficiency: As Plaintiff has already filed an original petition and amended petition in state court prior to the case being removed to this Court, Plaintiff must seek leave of court before filing another amended complaint. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 2/24/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 02/24 3:30 PM
***DISREGARD-ISSUED PER AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNFILED 2/24/25)***Summons Issued as to Marivi Rodriguez, Kimberly Sanford, Spencer Williams. (wxc) Modified on 2/24/2025 (wxc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 22, 2025
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 02/22 1:47 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Eric Ellis. Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ellis, Eric)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 02/22 1:32 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Eric Ellis. Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ellis, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
7 7 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Mon 02/24 1:24 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wxc)
Related: [-]
6 6 qcref Pittman Mon 02/24 1:23 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Cureton preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/21 3:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Ventura Foods, LLC filed by Eric Ellis. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ellis, Eric)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 02/21 2:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ventura Foods, LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Schatz, Katrin)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 02/21 2:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Ventura Foods, LLC. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-15284812) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Schatz, Katrin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Cover Sheet