Washington Western District Court
Judge:Lauren King
Referred: S Kate Vaughan
Case #: 2:25-cv-00353
Nature of Suit463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 3:59 AM PDT
Petitioner
Carlos Eduardo Ardiles-Adraz
245373503 NW DETENTION CENTER 1623 E. J STREET, SUITE 5
TACOMA, WA 98421
Represented By
Gregory Murphy
Federal Public Defender'S Office (sea)
contact info
Respondent
Pamela Bondi
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
US Attorney Habeas
contact info
Annalisa L Cravens
United States Attorney'S Office (sea)
contact info
Respondent
Drew Bostock
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
US Attorney Habeas
contact info
Annalisa L Cravens
United States Attorney'S Office (sea)
contact info
Respondent
Kristi Noem
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
US Attorney Habeas
contact info
Annalisa L Cravens
United States Attorney'S Office (sea)
contact info
Respondent
United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
US Attorney Habeas
contact info
Annalisa L Cravens
United States Attorney'S Office (sea)
contact info
Respondent
Warden
Represented By
US Attorney Habeas
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
11 11 notice Notice-Other Tue 04/22 8:55 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGE IN PETITIONER'S CUSTODY STATUS re6 Order for Return and Status Report filed by Respondents Pamela Bondi, Kristi Noem, Drew Bostock, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (APH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Monday, March 31, 2025
10 10 respm Declaration Mon 03/31 4:36 PM
DECLARATION of Wilfredo Baez-Santiago filed by Respondents Pamela Bondi, Kristi Noem, Drew Bostock, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement re8 MOTION to Dismiss AND RETURN MEMORANDUM (Cravens, Annalisa)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Declaration Mon 03/31 4:35 PM
DECLARATION of Annalisa L. Cravens filed by Respondents Pamela Bondi, Kristi Noem, Drew Bostock, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement re8 MOTION to Dismiss AND RETURN MEMORANDUM(Cravens, Annalisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
8 8 motion Dismiss Mon 03/31 4:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss AND RETURN MEMORANDUM , filed by Respondents Pamela Bondi, Kristi Noem, Drew Bostock, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Noting Date 4/28/2025, (Cravens, Annalisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Annalisa L Cravens on behalf of Respondents Pamela Bondi, Kristi Noem, Drew Bostock, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Cravens, Annalisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
6 6 order 1 - Order Fri 02/28 10:08 AM
ORDER FOR RETURN AND STATUS REPORT re1 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. Electronic posting of this Order and 4 Petitioners § 2241 Habeas Petition shall effect service upon the United States Attorney of the petition and all supporting documents. Service upon the United States Attorney is deemed to be service upon KRISTI NOEM, DREW BOSTOCK-SEATTLE FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR, WARDEN OF IMMIGRATION DETENTION CENTER, AND USCIS. On or before March 31, 2025, respondent shall file a return and status report (RSR) as provided in 28 U.S.C. § 2243, explaining why the Court should not grant petitioner's petition. As a part of such return, respondent(s) shall submit a memorandum of authorities in support of its position and state whether an evidentiary hearing is necessary. In accordance with LCR 7(d), respondent(s) shall note its return for consideration no earlier than 28 days after filing. Petitioner may file and serve a response not later than 21 days after the filing date of the return, and respondent(s) may file and serve a reply not later than 28 days after the filing date of the return. If petitioner's custody status changes at any point during this litigation, respondent(s) shall file a status update with the Court as soon as possible and no later than 14 days after the change(PS)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Fri 02/28 9:45 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Appoint Federal Public Defender as Counsel for Petitioner Carlos Eduardo Ardiles-Adraz; signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan.(PS)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/27 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Respondents Pamela Bondi, Kristi Noem, Drew Bostock, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Letter Thu 02/27 12:03 PM
LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (MIH)(cc: Petitioner via USPS)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 02/27 11:59 AM
Judge Lauren King and Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (MIH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
2 2 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 02/25 10:52 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel , filed by Petitioner Carlos Eduardo Ardiles-Adraz. Noting Date 2/25/2025, (Murphy, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 FPD Letter
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 02/25 10:50 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Related [+] filed by Carlos Eduardo Ardiles-Adraz.(Murphy, Gregory)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8855538