Original Case: 1:18-cv-07695

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01305
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 27, 2025 3:43 AM CST
Defendant - Appellant
TWD, LLC, a California limited liability company
Represented By
Darren J. Quinn
LAW OFFICES OF DARREN J. QUINN
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
GRUNT STYLE LLC,, an Illinois limited liability company
Represented By
Matthew De Preter
ARONBERG GOLDGEHN DAVIS & GARMISA
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/21/2025 9:36 AM CDT
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 03/11/2025. Docketing Statement due for Appellant TWD, LLC by 03/03/2025. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/07/2025 for TWD, LLC. [1] [7436797] 25-1305 (FP) [Entered: 02/25/2025 02:34 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 83 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Short Form
2 2 2 pgs Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Friday, March 14, 2025 at 1:00p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB [2] [7437237] 25-1305 (JMB) [Entered: 02/27/2025 08:34 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/14/2025 for TWD, LLC. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/14/2025 for Grunt Style LLC. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/04/2025 for Appellant TWD, LLC. JB [7437241] 25-1305 (JMB) [Entered: 02/27/2025 08:37 AM]
Related: [-]