Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:25-bk-10321
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
MOM CA Investco LLC
520 Newport Center Drive #480
Newport Beach, CA 92660
Represented By
John T Baxter
Buchalter
contact info
Shannon Forshay
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
R. Stephen McNeill
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Sameen Rizvi
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Garfinkle
Buchalter
contact info
Aaron H. Stulman
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
John Leland Murphree
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Christopher M. Samis
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Gregory Joseph Flasser
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Rebecca Wicks
Buchalter
contact info
Sarah R Gladieux
Potter Anderson & Corroon
contact info
Khaled Tarazi
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Ethan H. Sulik
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 2:26 AM EDT
Claims Agent
Stretto
www.stretto.com 410 Exchange, Ste 100
Irvine, CA 92602
Creditor
Lone Oak Mortgage Fund, LLC
Represented By
Adam Hiller
Hiller Law, LLC
contact info
Simon Aron
Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin, LLP
contact info
Elsa Horowitz
contact info
Creditor
Coastline Santa Monica Investments LLC
520 Newport Center Dr. Suite 480
Newport Beach, CA 92660
Represented By
Jaclyn C Marasco
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Ronald Richards
Ronald Richards & Associates
contact info
Creditor
PMF CA REIT, LLC
Represented By
Ann M. Kashishian
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Tullius
Tullius Law Group
contact info
Creditor
Wilshire Quinn Income Fund, LLC
Represented By
Daire J Pyle
Stern & Eisenberg, PC
contact info
Kelsey Luu
Ghidotti Berger, LLP
contact info
Kelsey X Luu
Ghidotti Berger LLP
contact info
Creditor
Preferred Bank
Represented By
Michael G. Busenkell
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Michael J Gomez
Frandzel Robins Bloom & Csato, L.C.
contact info
Michael J. Gomez
Frandzel Robins Bloom & Csato, L.C.
contact info
Gerrick Warrington
Frandzel Robins Bloom & Csato, L.C.
contact info
Creditor
Merritt Farms
Represented By
Riley C. Walter
Wanger Jones Helsley PC
contact info
Ian J. Quinn
Wanger Jones Helsley PC
contact info
Creditor
Enterprise Bank & Trust
Represented By
David Going
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
Eric M. Sutty
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
Creditor
Nano Banc
Represented By
Brian M. Clarke
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Jeffrey C. Wisler
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Timothy A. Davidson, II
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Creditor
Mohammad Honarkar
Represented By
Shanti M. Katona
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Stephen A. Smith
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Elisa Hyder
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Creditor
4G Wireless, Inc.
Represented By
Shanti M. Katona
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Stephen A. Smith
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Elisa Hyder
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Interested Party
Specialty DIP LLC
Represented By
Stuart Komrower
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Seth Van Aalten
Cole Schotz P.C
contact info
Justin R. Alberto
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Bryant P. Churbuck
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Bhajneet Singh Malik
Represented By
Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Raines Feldman Littrell LLP
contact info
Interested Party
MOM Members
Represented By
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Bayard P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
Deba Shyam
Represented By
Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Raines Feldman Littrell LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Andrew Stupin
Represented By
Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Raines Feldman Littrell LLP
contact info
Interested Party
The Picerne Group, Inc.
Represented By
Ezra Sutton
Paul Hastings
contact info
Roger G. Schwartz
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Avery Meng
Morris Nichols Arsht And Tunnell
contact info
Douglass Barron
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Interested Party
Banc of California
Represented By
James E O'Neill
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Edward A. Corma
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones
contact info
Ira D Kharasch
contact info
Richard M. Pachulski
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Malcolm M Bates
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 24 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
303 303 order Relief from Stay Mon 04/28 2:06 PM
Order Granting in Part and Adjourning in Part Motion of Mohammad Honarkar and 4G Wireless, Inc. for Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362(d) Related [+] Order Signed on 4/28/2025. (JMW)
Related: [-] 175 ,296
302 302 misc Transcript Mon 04/28 12:40 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/15/25 RE: Status Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/28/2025. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at Telephone number 302-654-8080. Filed by . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/5/2025. Redaction Request Due By 5/19/2025. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/29/2025. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/28/2025. (ASA)
Related: [-]
301 301 misc Transcript Mon 04/28 12:37 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/22/25 RE: Motions Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/28/2025. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at Telephone number 302-654-8080. Filed by . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/5/2025. Redaction Request Due By 5/19/2025. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/29/2025. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/28/2025. (ASA)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
300 300 7 pgs motion Extend - Motion Fri 04/25 10:22 PM
Motion to Extend //Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Further Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Periodic Reports Regarding the Value, Operations and Profitability of Entities in Which the Debtors' Estates Hold a Substantial or Controlling Interest Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2025 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/7/2025. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
299 299 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 04/25 5:32 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Amended Notice of Agenda for Hearing on April 24, 2025 at 3:30 P.M. (ET) (Docket No. 290) and Notice of Motion of Debtors for Entry of Orders (A)(I) Approving Bidding Procedures for Tesoro Property, (II) Scheduling the Bid Deadlines, (III) Scheduling Hearings and Objection Deadlines With Respect to the Sale of Tesoro Property, (IV) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, (V) Approving Contract Assumption and Assignment Procedures, and (VI) Granting Related Relief; and (B)(I) Approving the Sale of Tesoro Property Free and Clear of All Interests, (II) Approving Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 295) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 290 ,295
298 298 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 04/25 5:30 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Debtors Reply in Support of Final DIP Order (Docket No. 250) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 289
297 297 33 pgs answer Objection Fri 04/25 4:31 PM
Objection // United States Trustee's Objection to the Application of Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 327(e) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014 and 2016 for Authorization to Employ and Retain Buchalter, a Professional Corporation, as Special Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Related [+] Filed by U.S. Trustee (Bates, Malcolm)
Related: [-] 119
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Att: 11 Exhibit K
Att: 12 Exhibit L
Thursday, April 24, 2025
296 296 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Thu 04/24 9:00 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Granting in Part and Adjourning in Part Motion of Mohammad Honarkar and 4G Wireless, Inc. for Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362(d) Related [+]. Filed by Mohammad Honarkar, 4G Wireless, Inc.. (Ward, Christopher)
Related: [-] 175 175
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
295 295 notice Hearing - Notice Thu 04/24 6:31 PM
Notice of Hearing Regarding Motion of Debtors for Entry of Orders (A)(I) Approving Bidding Procedures for Tesoro Property, (II) Scheduling the Bid Deadlines, (III) Scheduling Hearings and Objection Deadlines With Respect to the Sale of Tesoro Property, (IV) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, (V) Approving Contract Assumption and Assignment Procedures, and (VI) Granting Related Relief; and (B)(I) Approving The Sale of Tesoro Property Free And Clear of All Interests, (II) Approving Assumption and Assignment Of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, And (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2025 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/7/2025. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-] 280
294 294 notice Withdrawal - Notice Thu 04/24 5:58 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' Motion for an Order Shortening and Limiting Notice with Respect to the Debtors' Bid Procedures Motion Related [+] Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Sulik, Ethan)
Related: [-] 281
293 293 audio Thu 04/24 3:55 PM
Court Date & Time [04/24/2025 03:29:40 PM]. File Size [ 3910 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:16:34 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
292 292 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 04/24 3:37 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Debtors Reply in Support of Final DIP Order (Docket No. 250), Motion of Debtors for Entry of Orders (A)(I) Approving Bidding Procedures for Tesoro Property, (II) Scheduling the Bid Deadlines, (III) Scheduling Hearings and Objection Deadlines With Respect to the Sale of Tesoro Property, (IV) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, (V) Approving Contract Assumption and Assignment Procedures, and (VI) Granting Related Relief; and (B)(I) Approving the Sale of Tesoro Property Free and Clear of All Interests, (II) Approving Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 280), Debtors Motion for an Order Shortening and Limiting Notice with Respect to the Debtors Bid Procedures Motion (Docket No. 281), and Notice of Agenda for Hearing on April 24, 2025 at 2:30 P.M. (ET) (Docket No. 282) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 250 ,280 ,281 ,282
291 291 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 04/24 3:34 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Filing of Revised Proposed Final Dip Order (Docket No. 247), Motion of the Debtors for Leave to File and Serve a Late Reply in Support of the Debtors Dip Financing Motion (Docket No. 251), and Amended Notice of Agenda for Hearing on April 22, 2025 at 10:30 A.M. (ET) (Docket No. 252) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 247 ,251 ,252
290 290 2 pgs notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice Thu 04/24 2:29 PM
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2025 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Sulik, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
289 289 10 pgs motion Employ/Retain - Application/Motion Wed 04/23 7:32 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Marcus & Millichap as the Debtors' Real Estate Broker in Connection with the Tesoro Property Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2025 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/7/2025. (Gladieux, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
288 288 answer Objection Wed 04/23 5:01 PM
Limited Objection to Motion of Debtors for Entry of Orders (A)(I) Approving Bidding Procedures for Tesoro Property, (II) Scheduling the Bid Deadlines, (III) Scheduling Hearings and Objection Deadlines With Respect to the Sale of Tesoro Property, (IV) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, (V) Approving Contract Assumption and Assignment Procedures, and (VI) Granting Related Relief; and (B)(I) Approving The Sale of Tesoro Property Free And Clear of All Interests, (II) Approving Assumption and Assignment Of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, And (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Preferred Bank (Busenkell, Michael)
Related: [-] 280
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
287 287 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Tue 04/22 7:48 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Trade Claimants and 503(b)(9) Claims; (II) Authorizing Banks to Honor and Process Check and Electronic Transfer Requests Related Thereto; and (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 230), Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Maintain Existing Insurance Programs and Pay All Obligations Arising Thereunder and (B) Renew, Revise, Extend, Supplement, or Enter into New Insurance Programs; (II) Authorizing All Banks to Honor Payments of Insurance Obligations; and (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 231), Notice of Filing of Proposed Final Dip Order (Docket No. 235)., Debtors Objection to Motion of Mohammad Honarkar and 4G Wireless, Inc. for Entry of an Order Granting Relief From the Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362(d) (Docket No. 238), Declaration of Mark Shinderman in Support of Debtors Stay Relief Objection (Docket No. 239), and Notice of Agenda for Hearing on April 22, 2025 at 10:30 A.M. (ET) (Docket No. 240) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 230 ,231 ,235 ,238 ,239 ,240
286 286 2 pgs notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice Tue 04/22 4:13 PM
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2025 at 02:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
285 285 crditcrd none Tue 04/22 3:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens([LINK 25-10321 BLS] ) [motion,msell] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A12139621, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
284 284 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 04/22 11:35 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of William S. Brody Related [+] Order Signed on 4/22/2025. (JMW)
Related: [-] 255
283 283 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 04/22 11:33 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Bernard D. Bollinger, Jr. Related [+] Order Signed on 4/22/2025. (JMW)
Related: [-] 254
282 282 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 04/22 10:38 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Ronald Richards Related [+] Order Signed on 4/22/2025. (JMW)
Related: [-] 253
281 281 10 pgs motion Shorten - Motion Tue 04/22 1:34 AM
Motion to Shorten //Debtors Motion for an Order Shortening and Limiting Notice with Respect to the Debtors Bid Procedures Motion Related [+] Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-] 280
Att: 1 Exhibit A
280 280 37 pgs motion Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens- Motion (FEE) Tue 04/22 1:25 AM
Motion For Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens(FEE) //Motion of Debtors for Entry of Orders (A)(I) Approving Bidding Procedures for Tesoro Property, (II) Scheduling the Bid Deadlines, (III) Scheduling Hearings and Objection Deadlines With Respect to the Sale of Tesoro Property, (IV) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, (V) Approving Contract Assumption and Assignment Procedures, and (VI) Granting Related Relief; and (B)(I) Approving The Sale of Tesoro Property Free And Clear of All Interests, (II) Approving Assumption and Assignment Of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, And (III) Granting Related Relief Fee Amount $199 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/1/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/28/2025. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 33 pgs Exhibit A
Monday, April 21, 2025
279 279 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 11:14 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10641 (Terra Laguna Beach, Inc.) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
278 278 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 11:12 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10451 (837 Park Avenue, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
277 277 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 11:10 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10450 (The Masters Building, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
276 276 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 11:08 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10449 (Laguna HW, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
275 275 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 11:06 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10448 (Laguna HI, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
274 274 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 11:04 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10447 (314 S. Harvard DE, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
273 273 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 11:02 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10446 (4110 West 3rd Street DE, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
272 272 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 11:00 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10445 (Hotel Laguna, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
271 271 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 10:58 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10444 (Aryabhata Group LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
270 270 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 10:55 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10442 (Tesoro Redlands DE, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
269 269 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 10:53 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10441 (Laguna Art District Complex, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
268 268 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 10:50 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10440 (777 at Laguna, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
267 267 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 10:47 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10439 (891 Laguna Canyon Road, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
266 266 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 10:44 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10438 (Laguna Festival Center, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
265 265 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 10:42 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10437 (Heisler Laguna, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
264 264 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 10:41 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10436 (694 NCH Apartments, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
263 263 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 10:38 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10435 (Cliff Drive Properties DE, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
262 262 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 10:36 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10434 (Duplex at Sleepy Hollow, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
261 261 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 10:34 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10433 (Sunset Cove Villas, LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
260 260 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 10:32 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10432 Related [+] for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-] treat at Laguna Villas, LLC
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
259 259 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 10:29 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-10323 (MOM BS Investco LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
258 258 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 10:27 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-10322 (MOM AS Investco LLC) for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cash Receipts and Disbursements
257 257 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 10:24 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Supporting Documents
256 256 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Mon 04/21 8:00 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service (Supplemental) re: Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Return Certain Tenant Security Deposits Owed Prepetition; (II) Authorizing the Debtors to Continue to Charge, Return, or Apply Tenant Security Deposits in the Ordinary Course; and (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 172) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 172
255 255 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Mon 04/21 4:52 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of William S. Brody of Buchalter, A Professional Corporation . Receipt Number 4666411, Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Gladieux, Sarah)
Related: [-]
254 254 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Mon 04/21 4:49 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Bernard D. Bollinger, Jr., of Buchalter, A Professional Corporation . Receipt Number 4666411, Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Gladieux, Sarah)
Related: [-]
253 253 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Mon 04/21 3:45 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Ronald Richards of the Law Offices of Ronald Richards . Receipt Number 4666276, Filed by Coastline Santa Monica Investments LLC. (Marasco, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
252 252 8 pgs notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Mon 04/21 3:27 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/22/2025 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Sulik, Ethan)
Related: [-]
251 251 motion Leave - Motion Mon 04/21 3:16 PM
Motion for Leave //Motion of the Debtors for Leave to File and Serve a Late Reply in Support of the Debtors' DIP Financing Motion Related [+] Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Sulik, Ethan)
Related: [-] 250
Att: 1 Exhibit A
250 250 answer Reply Mon 04/21 3:08 PM
Reply //Debtors' Reply in Support of Final DIP Order Related [+] Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC (Stulman, Aaron)
Related: [-] 89 ,187 ,234 ,235 ,241 ,242 ,247
249 249 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 04/21 2:59 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Joshua R. Taylor, Esquire. Related [+] Order Signed on 4/21/2025. (JMW)
Related: [-] 244
248 248 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 04/21 2:58 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Jeffrey M. Reisner, Esquire. Related [+] Order Signed on 4/21/2025. (JMW)
Related: [-] 243
247 247 misc Exhibit Mon 04/21 2:31 PM
Exhibit(s) //Notice of Filing of Revised Proposed Final DIP Order Related [+] Filed by MOM CA Investco LLC. (Stulman, Aaron)
Related: [-] 89 ,187 ,235
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
246 246 answer Reply Mon 04/21 11:41 AM
Reply Omnibus Reply in Support of Motion of Mohammad Honarkar and 4G Wireless, Inc. for Entry of an Order Granting Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362(d) Related [+] Filed by Mohammad Honarkar, 4G Wireless, Inc. (Ward, Christopher)
Related: [-] 175 ,223 ,236 ,237 ,238 ,245
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
245 245 misc Joinder (Attorney) Mon 04/21 9:21 AM
Joinder Related [+] Filed by Coastline Santa Monica Investments LLC. (Richards, Ronald)
Related: [-] 175