Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Benjamin Beaton
Referred: Lanny King
Case #: 5:25-cv-00029
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 5:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Global Win Capital Corporation
Represented By
Robert P. Johnson
Thompson Hine Llp - Cincinnati
contact info
Plaintiff
Tom Lawson
Represented By
David L. Kelly
Keuler Kelly Hutchins Blankenship & Sigler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
8 8 4 pgs order Order Mon 04/14 3:27 PM
ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC). Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the call by dialing 1-650-479-3207 and entering access code 2303 118 0494#. cc: counsel (JM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
7 7 misc Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 03/26 10:19 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)) identifying Corporate Parent Shanying International Holding Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Zhejiang Shanying Paper Co., Ltd. for Global Win Capital Corporation; filed by Global Win Capital Corporation. (Johnson, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 03/26 9:44 AM
TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A), the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge King for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge King may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel, LLK-CM (HMC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/25 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Johnson on behalf of Global Win Capital Corporation (Johnson, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/25 11:46 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Global Win Capital Corporation. (Johnson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 02/28 3:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Global Win Capital Corporation. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (HMC)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assignment Fri 02/28 3:28 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (HMC)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/28 3:27 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND MONETARY RELIEF filed by Tom Lawson against Global Win Capital Corporation. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AKYWDC-4201573. (HMC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Tendered Summons