24
|
|
24
order
02 - Minute Order
Mon 04/14 1:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele The parties are hereby directed to file monthly discovery status reports in the case utilizing the Joint Discovery Status Report form available on the Court's website in the Judges' Information section at www.oknd.uscourts.gov. The parties shall file joint discovery reports every thirty (30) days, with the first report due on June 2, 2025. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
|
23
|
|
23
order
05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s)
Mon 04/14 12:29 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 1/30/2026, Dispositive Motions due by 2/13/2026, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/9/2026, Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2026 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele, Jury Trial set for 7/7/2026 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
|
22
|
|
22
minutes
18 - Settlement Conference Held Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s)
Mon 04/14 10:30 AM
MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele: Settlement Conference held on 4/14/2025 , striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (Court Reporter: c5) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
order
02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s)
Thu 04/03 9:53 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele Upon review of the parties' Joint Status Report (Docket No. 20) and the requested deadlines therein, the Court hereby sets a scheduling conference in this matter for Monday, April 14, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. at 333 W. 4th Street, Tulsa, OK 74103, Fourth Floor, Courtroom #5. , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
misc
Joint Status Report per LCvR16-1(b)(1)
Tue 04/01 4:50 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Oklahoma Kenworth, LLC, PACCAR, Inc. (Cook, Rodney)
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
notice
Appearance - Attorney
Fri 03/28 4:31 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Wilson McGarry on behalf of Oklahoma Kenworth, LLC [Note: Attorney Wilson McGarry added to party Oklahoma Kenworth, LLC(pty:dft).] (McGarry, Wilson)
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
notice
Appearance - Attorney
Fri 03/28 4:29 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Evan Grant Ellis Vincent on behalf of Oklahoma Kenworth, LLC [Note: Attorney Evan Grant Ellis Vincent added to party Oklahoma Kenworth, LLC(pty:dft).] (Vincent, Evan)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
order
02 - Minute Order Directing - Party Name be Corrected
Thu 03/13 2:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for MHC Kenworth - Tulsa, LLC be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (mm, Dpty Clk)
|
16
|
|
16
notice
Notice of Party Name Correction
Thu 03/13 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Party Name Correction by MHC Kenworth - Tulsa, LLC (Cook, Rodney)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
order
01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report
Wed 03/12 1:19 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 4/2/2025) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
order
02 - Minute Order
Wed 03/12 1:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele Counsel for Defendant MHC Kenworth Tulsa, LLC., is hereby directed to file a separate Notice of Party Name Correction reflecting its true and correct name as referenced in its Answer (Docket No. 2-8) and Disclosure Statement (Docket No. 12), on or before March 19, 2025. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)
Wed 03/05 5:15 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Murphy-Hoffman Company LLC, Other Affiliate Murphy-Hoffman Holding Company for MHC Kenworth - Tulsa, LLC) by MHC Kenworth - Tulsa, LLC (Cook, Rodney)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
notice
Appearance - Attorney
Wed 03/05 5:12 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rodney Lynn Cook on behalf of MHC Kenworth - Tulsa, LLC (Cook, Rodney)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)
Wed 03/05 1:33 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smithey Environmental Services, LLC (Mitchell, Brian)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
notice
Appearance - Attorney
Wed 03/05 1:19 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian Lee Mitchell on behalf of Smithey Environmental Services, LLC (Mitchell, Brian)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
order
02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/03 9:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing MHC Kenworth - Tulsa, LLC to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (mm, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
order
15 - Notice of Assignment of Case to MJ
Fri 02/28 4:55 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (mm, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
order
02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement
Fri 02/28 4:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Smithey Environmental Services, LLC and PACCAR, Inc to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (mm, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)
Fri 02/28 4:51 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent PACCAR Inc, Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial Corp., Other Affiliate PACCAR of Canada Ltd., Other Affiliate PACCAR Australia Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate PACCAR Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Kenworth Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate PACCAR Capital Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate PACCAR Parts Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate PacLease Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate DAF Caminhes Brasil Indstria Ltda., Other Affiliate DAF Trucks N.V., Other Affiliate DAF Trucks Vlaanderen N.V., Other Affiliate DAF Trucks Limited (U.K.), Other Affiliate DAF Trucks Deutschland GmbH, Other Affiliate PACCAR Parts Deutschland GmbH, Other Affiliate DAF Trucks France, S.A.R.L., Other Affiliate DAF Trucks Norge AS, Other Affiliate DAF Vehiculos Industriales S.A.U., Other Affiliate DAF Veicoli Industriali S.P.A., Other Affiliate DAF Trucks Polska SP.Z.O.O., Other Affiliate PACCAR Trucks U.K. Ltd., Other Affiliate PACCAR Parts U.K. Limited, Other Affiliate Leyland Trucks Limited, Other Affiliate PACCAR Engine Company, Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial Services Ltd., Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial Ltd., Other Affiliate PACCAR Sales North America, Inc., Other Affiliate PACCAR Holding B.V., Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial Bulgaria EOOD, Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial Europe B.V., Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial Holdings Europe B.V., Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial Heinz BVBA, Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial Deutschland GmbH, Other Affiliate PACCAR Leasing GmbH, Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial Espana S.L.U., Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial France S.A.S., Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial Italia S.r.l., Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial PLC, Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial Nederland B.V., Other Affiliate PACCAR Financial Services Europe B.V., Other Affiliate PACCAR Participaces Ltda, Other Affiliate Banco PACCAR S.A., Other Affiliate PACCAR Holdings Panama, S.A., Other Affiliate PACCAR Colombia S.A.S., Other Affiliate PACCAR India Private Limited for PACCAR, Inc.) by PACCAR, Inc. (With attachments) (McGarry, Wilson)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
notice
Appearance - Attorney
Fri 02/28 3:40 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Evan Grant Ellis Vincent on behalf of PACCAR, Inc. (Vincent, Evan)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
notice
Appearance - Attorney
Fri 02/28 3:38 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rodney Lynn Cook on behalf of PACCAR, Inc. (Cook, Rodney)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
notice
Appearance - Attorney
Fri 02/28 3:33 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Wilson McGarry on behalf of PACCAR, Inc. (McGarry, Wilson)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 02/28 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2025-375 (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-3165587) by PACCAR, Inc. (With attachments) (McGarry, Wilson)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 02/28 3:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by PACCAR, Inc. (McGarry, Wilson)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
cmp
State Court Petition/Complaint
Fri 02/28 2:19 PM
PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against MHC Kenworth - Tulsa, LLC, PACCAR, Inc. by Smithey Environmental Services, LLC (mm, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
|