Case Filed:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 2:22 AM EST
Defendant
Payton K. Byford (1)
Represented By
Deirdre A. Murray
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lauren A Hulse
Xviii Airborne Corps, Office Of The Staff Judge Advocate
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/02/2025 2:56 AM EST
Friday, January 31, 2025
1 1 VIOLATION NOTICE 2497973 as to Payton K. Byford (1) count(s) 1. The personal identifiers have been redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act. An unredacted version has been filed under seal. (Rodriguez, Melissa)
Related: [-]
2 2 Unredacted Document1 Violation Notice. (Rodriguez, Melissa)
Related: [-]
3 3 Notice of Hearing as to Payton K. Byford: Initial Appearance set for 2/5/2025 at 08:00 AM in Fayetteville - Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers II. This is a mandatory appearance. Defendant received his court date when he was issued his violation notice. (Rodriguez, Melissa)
Related: [-]