South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Helen E Burris
Case #: 6:25-bk-00774
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC
657 Prospect Ave
Ridgefield, NJ 07657-1720
Represented By
Robert H. Cooper
The Cooper Law Firm
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee's Office
Strom Thurmond Federal Building 1835 Assembly St. Suite 953
Columbia, SC 29201


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 12:02 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
22 22 misc Proposed Order Mon 04/14 2:18 PM
Proposed Order RE: Application to Employ Robert H. Cooper as Attorney with Affidavit of Professional Filed by Robert H. Cooper of The Cooper Law Firm on behalf of Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC. Filed by Robert H. Cooper of The Cooper Law Firm on behalf of Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC. Related [+]. (Cooper, Robert)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, April 07, 2025
21 21 answer Objection Mon 04/07 4:13 PM
Objection to Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor ASR 1 S Main Greenville, LLC, Amended Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor ASR 1 S Main Greenville, LLC with Certificate of Service Filed by Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC Related [+]. (Cooper, Robert)
Related: [-] 12 ,14
Friday, April 04, 2025
20 20 order Extend Time Fri 04/04 4:31 PM
Order Enlarging Time For Filing Schedules, Statement Of Financial Affairs And Documents Required Under 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a). Related [+]. Document Served. (Montgomery, S)
Related: [-] 6
trustee Meeting of Creditors Held - Telephonic Meeting Fri 04/04 10:41 AM
Telephonic Meeting of Creditors Held and Examination of Debtor on April 4, 2025. Filed by US Trustee's Office. (Barr, Linda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
19 19 court Hearing Held Wed 04/02 2:23 PM
Hearing Held relating to: Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC. Related [+] (Stidham, Mark)
Related: [-] 6
18 18 court Status Hearing Held Wed 04/02 2:22 PM
Status Hearing Held. HB. Related [+] (Stidham, Mark)
Related: [-] 9
17 17 trustee U.S. Trustees Statement - No Creditors Committee Wed 04/02 12:05 PM
U.S. Trustee's Statement that No Creditors Committee has been appointed. Filed by US Trustee's Office. (Barr, Trustee Linda)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 29, 2025
16 16 misc Schedules/Statements Filed Sat 03/29 5:35 PM
Schedules Filed: Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedule A/B Schedule D Schedule E/F Schedule G Schedule H Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules; Statements Filed: Statement of Financial Affairs Profit and Loss Sheet for a Non-Individual Filed by Robert H. Cooper of The Cooper Law Firm on behalf of Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC. (Cooper, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
15 15 8 pgs motion Employ (Application) Fri 03/28 2:05 PM
Application to Employ Robert H. Cooper as Attorney with Affidavit of Professional Filed by Robert H. Cooper of The Cooper Law Firm on behalf of Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC. (Cooper, Robert)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Relief from Stay - Amended Fri 03/28 10:40 AM
Amended Motion for Relief from Stay, Hearing Notice and Certificate of Service RE: 1 South Main Street, Greenville, SC 29601. REASON FOR AMENDMENT: incorrect hearing location and date Filed by Raford Wainwright Bussey Jr of Holder Padgett Littlejohn & Prickett on behalf of ASR 1 S Main Greenville, LLC. Date Served 3/28/2025. Last day for objections is 4/11/2025. Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 10:30 AM at Greenville. (Bussey, Raford)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice Fri 03/28 10:35 AM
Raford Wainwright Bussey, Jr Notice of Appearance for ASR 1 S Main Greenville, LLC . Notice and service of this event are delegated pursuant to the Local Rules. Filed by Raford Wainwright Bussey Jr of Holder Padgett Littlejohn & Prickett on behalf of ASR 1 S Main Greenville, LLC. (Bussey, Raford)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
12 12 motion Relief from Stay Tue 03/25 4:14 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay, Hearing Notice and Certificate of Service RE: 1 South Main Street, Greenville, SC 29601. Filed by Murray Stokely Holder of Holder Padgett Littlejohn & Prickett, LL on behalf of ASR 1 S Main Greenville, LLC. Date Served 3/25/2025. Last day for objections is 4/8/2025. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 10:30 AM at Columbia (HB). (Holder, Murray)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application for Ejectment
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Relief from Automatic Stay
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet Tue 03/25 4:15 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 25-00774 hb] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A14306337, amount 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
11 11 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Thu 03/20 12:22 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 03/19/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 03/19 5:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by TN Dept of Revenue. (Willey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
9 9 court Status Hearing Mon 03/17 11:02 AM
Status Hearing scheduled . Document Served. Status hearing to be held on 4/2/2025 at 11:00 AM at Greenville. The case judge is Helen E. Burris. (Stidham, Mark)
Related: [-]
8 8 court Hearing (Document) Sched Mon 03/17 10:52 AM
Hearing scheduled relating to: Motion to Extend Time To File Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, and Documents Required Under 11 USC Section 521(a) with Certificate of Service Filed by Robert H. Cooper of The Cooper Law Firm on behalf of Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC.. Document Served . Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 4/2/2025 at 11:00 AM at Greenville. The case judge is Helen E. Burris. (Stidham, Mark)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, March 13, 2025
7 7 answer Response Thu 03/13 3:07 PM
Response to Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC with Certificate of Service Filed by US Trustee's Office Related [+]. (Poston, Brandon)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 motion Extend Time (Not for use in Adversary cases) Thu 03/13 1:05 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, and Documents Required Under 11 USC Section 521(a) with Certificate of Service Filed by Robert H. Cooper of The Cooper Law Firm on behalf of Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC. (Cooper, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
5 5 cmp Complaint Tue 03/11 1:43 PM
Adversary case 25-80013 Complaint by Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC against Tennessee Department of Revenue Core Proceeding. Fee: 350.00. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Cooper, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
4 4 court Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors Thu 03/06 12:27 AM
Certificate of Service of Meeting of Creditors Notice as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 03/05/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, March 03, 2025
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Mon 03/03 1:38 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors. 0. Document Served. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/4/2025 at 09:00 AM at Telephone - 341. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 6/3/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 7/3/2025. (Montgomery, S)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 01, 2025
2 2 misc Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing Sat 03/01 1:56 PM
Debtor's Request to Activate Electronic Noticing. DOCUMENT IMAGE AVAILABLE ONLY TO COURT USERS AND THE TRUSTEE/US TRUSTEE. Filed by Robert H. Cooper of The Cooper Law Firm on behalf of Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC. (Cooper, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty) Sat 03/01 1:55 PM
Chapter 11 Non-Individual Filed by Robert H. Cooper of The Cooper Law Firm on behalf of Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC. Deadline for Filing Chapter 11 Small Business Plan and Disclosure Statement ends 12/26/2025. (Cooper, Robert)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet Sat 03/01 2:04 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty)([LINK 25-00774 ) [misc,volp11ac] (1738.00). Receipt Number A14273094, amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]