California Central District Court
Judge:Anne Hwang
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 2:25-cv-01807
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of CA, County of Los Angeles, 25STCV03100
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 2:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Premier Financial Alliance, Inc.
Represented By
Mark Reynold Prioste Figueiredo
Structure Law Group LLP
contact info
Jorge Martins
Structure Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Margarita Kleeschulte
Represented By
Mark Reynold Prioste Figueiredo
Structure Law Group LLP
contact info
Pola Teresa Teresa Bernabe
Laurel Employment Law, Apc
contact info
Joshua Ittan White
Laurel Employment Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
12 12 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 03/31 2:41 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Anne Hwang. ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES. On the Court's own motion, the motion to compel5 , currently set for hearing on April 17, 2025, is hereby ordered continued to MAY 14, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ys)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/27 9:10 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration5 filed by Plaintiff Margarita Kleeschulte.(Bernabe, Pola Teresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration Plaintiff's Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Pola Bernabe, Esq.,
Att: 4 Proof of Service of Documents
Monday, March 17, 2025
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/17 4:52 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Anne Hwang.READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and differs in some respects from the Local Rules. See order for details. (ys)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
9 9 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/12 9:02 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Wed 03/12 9:01 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge Anne Hwang for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:25-cv-01807-AH (ADSx). (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
7 7 textonly MJDAP Timely Opt-Out Tue 03/11 4:24 PM
Declination of Consent form received on 3/10/2025 was submitted within deadline set forth in L.R. 73-2.1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bem)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
6 6 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 03/11 10:05 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration5 . The following error(s) was/were found: motion does not comply with Local Rule 7-4, which requires that the date of the hearing appear on the first page of the notice of motion In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (san)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Compel Arbitration Mon 03/10 5:25 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Premier Financial Alliance, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/17/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Figueiredo, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Mark R. Figueiredo In Support,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/05 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Margarita Kleeschulte Margarita Kleeschulte, identifying Premier Financial Alliance, Inc., David Carroll, and Margarita Kleeschulte. (Attorney Mark Reynold Prioste Figueiredo added to party Margarita Kleeschulte(pty:pla))(Figueiredo, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 03/05 9:22 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Attachment(s): #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The document(s) should have been filed separately using their true events. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (sh)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Wed 03/05 9:19 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/03 12:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, County of Los Angeles, case number 25STCV03100 Receipt No: ACACDC-39213978 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Premier Financial Alliance, Inc.. (Attorney Mark Reynold Prioste Figueiredo added to party Premier Financial Alliance, Inc.(pty:dft))(Figueiredo, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 03/05 9:14 AM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Premier Financial Alliance, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Margarita Kleeschulte.[FILED IN STATE COURT 02/04/2025 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]