Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:David S Cercone
Case #: 2:25-cv-00330
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
RANDAL B. TODD
Plaintiff
NOBLE PRINCE KEEN KAMOORY EL
5831 Forward Ave. 1300
Pittsburgh, PA 15217


Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/09 2:48 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against RANDAL B. TODD, filed by NOBLE PRINCE KEEN KAMOORY EL. (ert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 03/07 8:54 AM
Judge David S. Cercone added. (ert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/06 4:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by NOBLE PRINCE KEEN KAMOORY EL. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Affidavit,
Att: 4 Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit B