California Northern District Court
Judge:Noel Wise
Referred: Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 3:25-cv-02202
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 1:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Amrita Ahuja
Defendant
Neha Narula
Defendant
Mary Meeker
Defendant
James McKelvey
Defendant
Randall Garutti
Defendant
Jack Dorsey
Defendant
Paul Deighton
Defendant
Shawn Carter
Defendant
Amy Brooks
Defendant
Roelof Botha
Defendant
Block, Inc.
Interested Party
Anand Roy
Represented By
Robert Charles Moest
The Brown Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald Wallace
Represented By
Francis J. Flynn, Jr.
Law Office Of Francis J. Flynn, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 88 minutes ago
Monday, March 24, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Mon 03/24 4:34 PM
ORDER RELATING CASE. 25-CV-02202-AMO is ordered related to 25-CV-00642-NW and shall be reassigned to Judge Noel Wise. Signed by Judge Noel Wise on 3/24/2025. (akw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 03/24 2:29 PM
Clerk's Notice on Reassignment. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Martinez-Olguin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/] . Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2025 no later than 12:00 PM PST. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/24 10:25 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 03/24 9:35 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 03/17 7:26 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Donald Wallace.. (Flynn, Francis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 03/11 2:48 PM
Summons Issued as to Amrita Ahuja, Block, Inc., Roelof Botha, Amy Brooks, Shawn Carter, Paul Deighton, Jack Dorsey, Randall Garutti, James McKelvey, Mary Meeker, Neha Narula. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
9 9 misc Proposed Summons Mon 03/10 8:01 AM
Proposed Summons. (Flynn, Francis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/05 3:36 PM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 25-cv-00642. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on March 5, 2025. (sklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 03/05 1:18 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 03/05 10:42 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/19/2025. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 03/05 10:38 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Case reviewed; does not fall under nationwide injunction. No action necessary. Re:1 Complaint, filed by Donald Wallace (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 03/05 1:13 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ONE SUMMONS FOR ALL DEFENDANTS Please list all defendants on ONE summons, in the "To:" space on the summons add (See Attached) and on the attached additional page list all the defendants to be served. Re: 5 Proposed Summons filed by Donald Wallace (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
5 5 Proposed Summons. (Flynn, Francis)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-13 by Donald Wallace (Flynn, Francis) Modified on 3/5/2025 (anj, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Francis J. Flynn, Jr on behalf of Donald Wallace (Flynn, Francis)
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Donald Wallace (Flynn, Francis)
Related: [-]
1 1 48 pgs COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amrita Ahuja, Block, Inc., Roelof Botha, Amy Brooks, Shawn Carter, Paul Deighton, Jack Dorsey, Randall Garutti, James McKelvey, Mary Meeker, Neha Narula ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20413578.). Filed by Donald Wallace.(Flynn, Francis) Modified on 3/5/2025 (anj, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Verification,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet