Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:23-bk-10571

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:25-ap-01115
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Coletta's Trading, Inc., a California Corporation
6100 Avalon
Los Angeles, CA 90003
Represented By
Coletta's Trading, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard A Marshack, Trustee of the LPG Liquidation Trust
870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
Represented By
D Edward Hays
Marshack Hays Wood LLP
contact info
Chad V Haes
Marshack Hays Wood LLP
contact info
Aaron E. De Leest
Marshack Hays Wood LLP
contact info
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays Wood LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
6 6 notice Notice Tue 03/18 10:39 PM
Notice to Defendants re: Compliance with Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 7026-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack. (Haes, Chad)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/18 10:38 PM
Summons Service Executed on Coletta's Trading, Inc. 3/18/2025 (Haes, Chad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 03/13 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 03/11 5:15 PM
Summons Issued on Coletta's Trading, Inc. Date Issued 3/11/2025, Answer Due 4/10/2025 Related [+] Status Conference hearing to be held on 6/5/2025 at 10:00 AM In Person at Crtrm 5C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (NB8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack
2 2 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 03/11 5:14 PM
Order RE: Early Meeting Of Counsel, Status Conference Instructions, And General Procedures. IT IS ORDERED: The Court Finds It Appropriate To Issue The Following Order In Lieu Of Its Early Meeting Of Counsel And Status Conference Instructions. (All Status Conferences Will Be Conducted IN PERSON In Courtroom 5C, Located At 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701. Any Out-Of-District Attorney Admitted Pro Hac Vice Must Also Have Local Counsel Present. No Virtual Or Telephonic Appearances Will Be Permitted.) (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER RULING.) (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/11/2025 (NB8)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/11 12:56 PM
Adversary case 8:25-ap-01115. Complaint by Richard A Marshack against Coletta's Trading, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Haes, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet