South Carolina District Court
Judge:Joseph Dawson, III
Case #: 4:25-cv-01597
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2025
Case in other court:Florence County Common Pleas Court, 2024-CP-21-02842
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 6:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Justin Boone
Represented By
H Thomas Morgan, Jr
Smith Robinson Holler Dubose And Morgan (cam)
contact info
Defendant
Florence County Sheriff's Office
Represented By
H Thomas Morgan, Jr
Smith Robinson Holler Dubose And Morgan (cam)
contact info
Plaintiff
Bernice Dorsey
Represented By
Cezar E McKnight
Cezar E Mcknight Law Office
contact info
Ryan Christopher Andrews
Law Office Of Ryan C Andrews LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Florence County Sheriff's Department
Terminated: 04/07/2025
Represented By
H Thomas Morgan, Jr
Smith Robinson Holler Dubose And Morgan (cam)
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
15 15 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/09 11:08 AM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/30/2025, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/14/2025, Rule 26 Report due by 5/14/2025, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/4/2025, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/7/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/6/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/6/2025, Discovery due by 10/6/2025, Motions due by 11/5/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 2/3/2026, Mediation Due by 10/6/2025. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 4/9/2025. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 04/08 3:00 PM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by Justin Boone, Florence County Sheriff's Department.(Morgan, H)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/07 11:00 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bernice Dorsey. Service due by 7/7/2025 (Andrews, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
10 10 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 04/01 3:33 PM
TEXT ORDER granting, in part, Consent Motion to Amend the Pleadings and Withdraw Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend the pleadings and caption in this matter, changing the incorrectly identified Defendant Florence County Sheriff's Department to the Florence County Sheriff's Office. Plaintiff is directed to file the Amended Complaint within 7 days of this Order. In light of the foregoing, 6 Defendant Florence County Sheriff's Department Motion to Dismiss is terminated as moot. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 4/1/2025. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
9 9 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 03/26 11:19 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bernice Dorsey.(Andrews, Ryan)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Amend/Correct Wed 03/26 11:18 AM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct the Pleadings by Bernice Dorsey. Response to Motion due by 4/9/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Andrews, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/19 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Christopher Andrews on behalf of Bernice Dorsey (Andrews, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
6 6 motion Dismiss Wed 03/12 12:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Justin Boone, Florence County Sheriff's Department. Response to Motion due by 3/26/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Morgan, H)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
5 5 service Certificate of Service Wed 03/12 10:53 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Justin Boone, Florence County Sheriff's Department re4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories,1 Notice of Removal,3 Answer to Complaint Notice of Removal, 2 Civil Cover Sheet (swel, )
Related: [-]
4 4 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 03/12 10:51 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Justin Boone, Florence County Sheriff's Department.(swel, )
Related: [-]
3 3 respoth Answer to Complaint Notice of Removal Wed 03/12 10:50 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Justin Boone, Florence County Sheriff's Department. (swel, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 03/12 10:48 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Florence County Common Pleas Court, case number 2024-CP 21-02842 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12316943), filed by Florence County Sheriff's Department, Justin Boone.(swel, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents Amended Complaint