Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-00952
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 13, 2025 2:49 AM CDT
Defendant
Judith Maritza Flores-Navas (1)
Represented By
Margarito Gonzalez Rodriguez
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/13/2025 4:01 AM CDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
Arrest of Judith Maritza Flores-Navas (ll)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Judith Maritza Flores-Navas by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda as to Judith Maritza Flores-Navas. (ll)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Judith Maritza Flores-Navas. (ll)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance as to Judith Maritza Flores-Navas held on 3/10/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (T. McEneny). (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Judith Maritza Flores-Navas, (Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 3/13/2025 03:30 PM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll)
Related: [-]