Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas A Varlan
Referred: Debra C Poplin
Case #: 3:25-mc-00010
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Terminated:Apr 04, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 motion In Forma Pauperis (Proceed) Mon 04/14 2:41 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Travis B Williams. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Envelope
6 6 motion Appoint Counsel Mon 04/14 2:37 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Travis B Williams. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Envelope
Friday, March 28, 2025
5 5 misc Letter Fri 03/28 2:43 PM
Letter from Travis Williams (MKM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Envelope
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Create Case Relationship Tue 03/18 4:47 PM
ORDER. The undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Williams v. Loudon County Sheriffs Department, No. 3:24-CV-23. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin, this case will also be assigned to District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 3/18/2025. c/m Travis B Williams, 923 Highland Avenue, Loudon, TN 37774. Create association to 3:24-cv-00023-TAV-DCP. (MKM)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 03/18 4:44 PM
District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
3 3 notice Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address Thu 03/13 2:26 PM
Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. c/m Travis B Williams, 923 Highland Avenue, Loudon, TN 37774. (MKM)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Deficiency (IFP) Thu 03/13 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency (IFP) - The Court is in receipt of your complaint/petition. However, in order for this matter to proceed, you must either pay the required filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. c/m Travis B Williams, 923 Highland Avenue, Loudon, TN 37774 with IFP application. (MKM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/13 2:19 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Travis B Williams. Filing fee not paid. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Envelope