Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Grace E Robson
Case #: 6:25-bk-01445
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2025
Dismissed:Apr 10, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Jaica Creative LLC
2005 Tree Fork Ln Unit 113
Longwood, FL 32750-3533
Represented By
Jaica Creative LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801


Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Saturday, April 12, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order/Notice Dismissing Case Sun 04/13 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order/Notice Dismissing Case. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #13 )
Friday, April 11, 2025
14 14 trustee Ch 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution C-case dism or conv, fee award not recd Fri 04/11 7:26 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $0.00, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. Filed by Trustee Andrew Layden. (Layden, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
13 13 order Order Dismissing Case (BK cases only) Thu 04/10 2:15 PM
Order Dismissing Case for Failure to Secure Legal Counsel . Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Dello Iacono, Ann)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, March 24, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance on behalf of United States Trustee (Attorneys for U.S. Trustee Only) Mon 03/24 9:10 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Audrey M Aleskovsky on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Aleskovsky, Audrey)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 23, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Mon 03/24 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 03/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Saturday, March 22, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sun 03/23 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 03/22/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
Friday, March 21, 2025
9 9 court 341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline Fri 03/21 3:17 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/14/2025 at 10:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. Proofs of Claims due by 5/23/2025. (Faye)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
8 8 3 pgs order Order Prescribing Procedures - Ch. 11 SubV Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, Set Status Conf Thu 03/20 11:04 AM
Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/22/2025 at 01:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Tonya)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Thu 03/20 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 03/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Thu 03/20 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 03/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #4 )
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
5 5 1 pgs trustee Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Tue 03/18 11:17 AM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee . Andrew Layden added to the case. Meeting of Creditors scheduled for April 14, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. telephonically via US Trustee - Orlando. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Murray, Wanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Verified Statement
Monday, March 17, 2025
4 4 court Notice of Deficient Filing (BK) Mon 03/17 4:31 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Missing Summary of Asset and Liabilities, Schedules A-H (except C), Statement of Financial Affairs, List of 20 largest creditors, Small Business Balance Sheet, Corporate Ownership Statement, Case Management Summary, Certificate or resolution authorizing debtor to file bankruptcy petition . (Lidia)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Of Impending Dismissal Mon 03/17 4:26 PM
Order of Impending Dismissal Corporate Debtor shall retain counsel or the case may be dismissed Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lidia)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, March 14, 2025
2 2 court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select) Fri 03/14 5:14 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by KL. Receipt Number 60002417. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 03/14 3:41 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. Filing Fee Paid. Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Jaica Creative LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 6/12/2025. (Lee Hue, Karla)
Related: [-]
court ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Fri 03/14 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]