Anthony Basile et al v. Valeant Pharmaceutical International, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-09629 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 16, 2014 |
Terminated: | Dec 17, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 14, 2015 4:13 AM PDT |
Defendant
AGMS, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
William A. Ackman
|
|
Defendant
PS Fund 1, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Pershing Square Capital Management, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Valeant Pharmaceuticals International
|
|
Defendant
Valeant Pharmaceutical International, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
PS Management, GP, LLC
|
|
Movant
PS Management, GP, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Basile
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 17, 2014 | ||
5 | 5
transfer
Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73)
Wed 12/17 9:18 AM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Jay C. Gandhi. New Case Number 8:14-cv-02004-JLS (JCGx). (et) |
|
Tuesday, December 16, 2014 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Related Case(s)
Tue 12/16 9:06 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) Anthony Basile. Under L.R. 83-1.3 Related Case(s): 14-cv-1214-DOC (ANx) (Bottini, Francis) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 12/16 8:31 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 Anthony Basile.(Bottini, Francis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment to Summons (Identifying the Parties) | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 12/16 8:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anthony Basile. (Bottini, Francis) |
|
1 | 1
34
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 12/16 7:55 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-14933641 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Francis A Bottini, Jr added to party Anthony Basile(pty:pla))(Bottini, Francis) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Certification of Named Plaintiff Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws |