North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Referred: Kimberly A Swank
Case #: 5:25-cv-00153
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Case in other court:State Court of North Carolina-County of Wake, 25CV006136-910
Last checked: Friday Mar 21, 2025 2:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Columbia Casualty Company
Represented By
Tien K. Cheng
Mcangus, Goudelock & Courie, Llc - Nc
contact info
Defendant
David Allen Company, Inc.
P.O. Box 27705
Raleigh, NC 27611


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Special Appearance Wed 04/23 11:42 AM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Tien K. Cheng on behalf of Columbia Casualty Company. (Cheng, Tien)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 1 pgs discov Order for Discovery Plan Mon 03/31 5:06 PM
ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/31/2025. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 03/31 2:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Columbia Casualty Company. (Cheng, Tien)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 11:49 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Madison B. Waller on behalf of David Allen Company, Inc.. (Waller, Madison)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 11:47 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Evan Monroe Musselwhite on behalf of David Allen Company, Inc.. (Musselwhite, Evan)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 03/31 11:45 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by David Allen Company, Inc. (Wooten, Amy)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 11:42 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Amy Holbrook Wooten on behalf of David Allen Company, Inc.. (Wooten, Amy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
utility Case Selected for Mediation Fri 03/28 4:41 PM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Selection of Mediator form are available on the court's Website,[LINK:www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx] . Please serve this list on all parties. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
8 8 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 03/27 3:52 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Columbia Casualty Company (Cheng, Tien)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 notice Notice-other Mon 03/24 1:09 PM
Notice filed by Columbia Casualty Company regarding Notice of Deficiency, Supplemental Removal Coversheet . (Cheng, Tien)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice-other Mon 03/24 1:07 PM
Notice filed by Columbia Casualty Company regarding1 Notice of Removal, Civil Coversheet . (Cheng, Tien)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice-other Mon 03/24 9:47 AM
Notice to Counsel Regarding Removal of Case to Eastern District of North Carolina. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 03/24 9:23 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Notice of Removal. Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event using the event Notice-Other as soon as possible. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 03/24 9:23 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Notice of Removal. Counsel failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the courts website and can be filed using the event Notice-Other. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 03/21 4:28 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Columbia Casualty Company (Cheng, Tien)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Fri 03/21 11:50 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Eric A. Fitzgerald filed by Columbia Casualty Company. (Cheng, Tien)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/21 11:47 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Tien K. Cheng on behalf of Columbia Casualty Company. (Cheng, Tien)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/21 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Columbia Casualty Company from Superior Court of Wake County, NC, case number 25CV006136-910. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-8033863), filed by Columbia Casualty Company. (Cheng, Tien)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Complaint