Washington Western District Court
Judge:Barbara J Rothstein
Case #: 2:25-cv-00521
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 2:11 PM PDT
Defendant
Bellingham School District
Plaintiff
A. M.
Represented By
Lara R Hruska
Cedar Law PLLC
contact info
Whitney Fowler Hill
Cedar Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
M. S. M.
Represented By
Lara R Hruska
Cedar Law PLLC
contact info
Whitney Fowler Hill
Cedar Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
S. S. M.
Represented By
Lara R Hruska
Cedar Law PLLC
contact info
Whitney Fowler Hill
Cedar Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of Service Fri 03/28 2:41 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant All Defendants (Hruska, Lara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
4 4 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Thu 03/27 4:03 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/1/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/8/2025, Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2025. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (NAW)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc BJR Standing Order (FORM) Thu 03/27 4:02 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. (NAW)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 03/27 9:15 AM
Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (AVC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/26 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shane P Brady on behalf of Defendant Bellingham School District. (Brady, Shane)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/24 2:17 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND Related [+] filed by A. M..(Hruska, Lara)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8897045
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet