Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael J Mcshane
Case #: 6:25-cv-00487
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025
Case in other court:Douglas County Circuit Court, 25CV11085
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 25, 2025 11:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Douglas Lee Foust
540 Stearns Lane
Oakland, OR 97462
Plaintiff
Janna Kirstin Roselund
Represented By
Kimberly S. Brown
Kimberly S. Brown
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 motion Vacate Thu 04/24 9:40 AM
Motion to Vacate Dismissal5 and Reinstate Action. Filed by Douglas Lee Foust. (jw)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_ans Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 04/24 9:37 AM
Response to Order to Show Cause 4 . Filed by Douglas Lee Foust. (jw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
6 6 oth_evt Transmittal of Case to State Court Tue 04/22 3:45 PM
Transmittal of Certified Copy of Docket Sheet and Certified Copy of Judgment5 to Douglas County Circuit Court. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/22/2025.) (jw)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Judgment - Terminate Case Tue 04/22 2:38 PM
JUDGMENT: On April 4, 2025, the Court ordered Defendant to show cause why this action should not be remanded to state court for lack of jurisdiction. ECF No. 4 . Defendant did not respond. Based on the record, this action is REMANDED to the Douglas County Circuit Court, Case Number 25CV11085. Signed on 4/22/2025 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/23/2025.) (cp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
4 4 order Show Cause Fri 04/04 5:00 PM
Order to Show Cause: Defendant filed a Notice of Removal in this action Plaintiff filed in State Court seeking a Petition for Dissolution of Unregistered Domestic Partnership. ECF No.1 . In that notice, Defendant argues this Court has diversity jurisdiction "because it is between citizens of different states." ECF1 , 2. In the attached Petition, however, Plaintiff swears, under threat of perjury, that she and Defendant "have been residents and domiciliary of Oregon for six (6) months immediately prior to the filing of this Petition." ECF No.1 , 6. Federal courts have an inherent duty to inquire, even sua sponte, when jurisdiction is in question. Mt. Healthy City Sch. Dist. Bd. Educ. v. Doyle, 429 U.S. 274, 278 (1977). Defendant is granted 14 days to show cause why this action should not be remanded to State Court based on lack of jurisdiction. Show Cause in Writing is due by 4/21/2025. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/7/2025.) (cp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
3 3 oth_evt Correction of the Record Tue 03/25 10:58 AM
Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding1 Notice of Removal (Main attachment). A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: An incorrect PDF was attached to the entry. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/25/2025.) (cw)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Tue 03/25 10:33 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 7/23/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/22/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 8/22/2025. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/25/2025.) (sss)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 03/25 10:29 AM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 25CV11085 from Douglas County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $405 collected. Receipt No. 15462 issued. Filed by Douglas Lee Foust.. (sss) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/25/2025) (cw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet