Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:25-cv-00552
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 25, 2025 6:07 PM PDT
Defendant
Solotech U.S. Corporation
Plaintiff
Donna Solomon
Represented By
Jemma Dunn
Greenberg Gross LLP
contact info
Matthew T Hale
Greenberg Gross LLP
contact info
Michael Allen Burnette
Greenberg Gross LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 11:10 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donna Solomon. Solotech U.S. Corporation waiver sent on 4/23/2025, answer due 6/22/2025. (Burnette, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
11 11 order Standing Order Mon 03/31 5:54 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
10 10 notice Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Fri 03/28 3:42 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:25-cv-00552-GMN-NJK . (no image attached) (HAM)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 03/28 1:54 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Solotech U.S. Corporation re1 Complaint,,. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc QC Notice Fri 03/28 1:46 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No.6 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No.6 using the appropriate docket entry title. (no image attached) (HAM)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Notice to Clerk re Assignment to MJ Fri 03/28 12:52 PM
NOTICE to Clerk of Court regarding assignment of case to Magistrate Judge. (The attached document is restricted to the Office of the Clerk and is not viewable. The filer of this document is also restricted. See General Orders 2023-11 and 2023-12.)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Plaintiff Brief (for social security cases only) Fri 03/28 12:38 PM
ERROR: Wrong event selected. See 7 Notice. OBJECTION/APPEAL Magistrate Judge order or ruling under LR IB 3-1 by Plaintiff Donna Solomon. Responses due by 4/11/2025. (Hale, Matthew) Modified on 3/28/2025 (HAM)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Option to Decline MJ - FORM Fri 03/28 12:02 PM
OPTION TO DECLINE MAGISTRATE JUDGE OVERSEEING YOUR CASE. The attached form must be filed in the docket or received by the Clerk within 21 days of your first appearance in the case should you choose to decline consent. (A copy of the form has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (ALZ)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc General Orders regarding MJ assignment Fri 03/28 12:01 PM
GENERAL ORDER 2023-11 IN RE: CONSENT AND REFERRALS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGES UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 636. (A copy of the General Order has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (ALZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
3 3 notice ENE Notice Fri 03/28 12:01 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. No ENE will be conducted in cases subject to arbitration. Parties to cases subject to mandatory arbitration, as well as parties who agree to arbitrate, must notify the Court of the same no later than 14 days after the date of this Notice. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. (no image attached) (ALZ)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 03/25 4:06 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Donna Solomon. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dunn, Jemma)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 4:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Solotech U.S. Corporation (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7997754) by Donna Solomon. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/4/2025. Proof of service due by 6/23/2025. (Dunn, Jemma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons re Solotech U.S. Corporation
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 03/28 11:58 AM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ALZ)
Related: [-]