Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00045
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 2:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Joel Lopez (1)
Represented By
David E Sloan
Keith & Lorfing
contact info
Defendant
Juan Quiroz-Rodriguez (2)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Amarillo
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Felipe Zavala-FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Anna Marie Bell-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/26/2025 3:25 AM CDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
Hearing Modification: Added Hearing. Preliminary Examination set for 3/31/2025 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (mcrd)
Related: [-]
Hearing Modification: Added Hearing. Preliminary Examination set for 3/26/2025 01:45 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (mcrd)
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case includes a request for the case to remain sealed until.) as to Joel Lopez (1), Juan Quiroz-Rodriguez (2). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Pretrial Detention and Continuance filed by USA as to Joel Lopez (mcrd)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Pretrial Detention and Continuance filed by USA as to Juan Quiroz-Rodriguez (mcrd)
Related: [-]
6 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Juan Quiroz-Rodriguez: Initial Appearance set for 3/24/2025 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 3/24/2025) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Joel Lopez: Initial Appearance set for 3/24/2025 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 3/24/2025) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
8 8 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno: Initial Appearance as to Juan Quiroz-Rodriguez held on 3/24/2025. Date of Arrest: 3/24/2025. Deft first appearance. Deft advised of rights/charge(s). Deft appeared without counsel. Deft requested appointed counsel. Financial affidavit executed. Counsel appointed. Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Joshua Jerome Frausto-DOJ; Defense - N/A. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :12. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (Interpreter Integrity Translation - R. Perales.) (USPO Gonzales.) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
9 9 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Juan Quiroz-Rodriguez. (nht)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Juan Quiroz-Rodriguez. Federal Public Defender - Amarillo for Juan Quiroz-Rodriguez appointed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 3/24/2025) (nht)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER ON INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Juan Quiroz-Rodriguez (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 3/24/2025) (nht)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER SETTING DETENTION HEARING AND ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION PURSUANT TO BAIL REFORM ACT: (Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing set for 3/31/2025 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno.) re:5 Motion to Continue as to Juan Quiroz-Rodriguez (2) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 3/24/2025) (nht)
Related: [-]
13 13 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno: Initial Appearance as to Joel Lopez held on 3/24/2025. Date of Arrest: 3/24/2025. Deft first appearance. Deft advised of rights/charge(s). Deft appeared without counsel. Deft intends to retain counsel. Financial affidavit executed. Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Joshua Jerome Frausto-DOJ; Defense - N/A. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :11. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Delgado Reyes.) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
14 14 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Joel Lopez (nht)
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER ON INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Joel Lopez (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 3/24/2025) (nht)
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER SETTING DETENTION HEARING AND ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION PURSUANT TO BAIL REFORM ACT (Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing set for 3/26/2025 01:45 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno.) re:4 Motion to Continue as to Joel Lopez (1) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 3/24/2025) (nht)
Related: [-]