Virginia Western District Court
Judge:Robert S Ballou
Referred: Pamela Meade Sargent
Case #: 7:25-cv-00214
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/04/2025 12:11 AM EDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
3 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account; Statement of Assets; Responses due by 4/30/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/28/2025. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party/Parties via US Mail)(jv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Wayne Barksdale. (mlp) Modified Replaced deficient/incorrect pdf document with file stamped pdf document on 3/28/2025 (mlp).
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Pam Bondy, Congress of the United States, Donald Trump, filed by Donald Wayne Barksdale.(mlp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Facts and Law in Support of Civil Action Complaint