New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Case #: 1:25-cv-02539
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 27, 2025 1:07 PM EDT
All Plaintiffs
Marco Meier
Represented By
Matthew Paul Madzelan
Joseph & Norinsberg LLC
contact info
Jitesh Dudani
Phillips & Associates, Attorneys At Law
contact info
Defendant
Google LLC
111 81 8th Ave.
New York, NY 10011
Defendant
Marta Martinez


Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 04/28 9:43 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Google LLC waiver sent on 4/25/2025, answer due 6/24/2025. Document filed by Google LLC..(Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/28 9:41 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Sergio Gomez-Sanchez on behalf of Google LLC..(Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
10 10 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/31 4:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dudani, Jitesh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 03/28 10:59 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marta Martinez..(jgo)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 03/28 10:58 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google LLC..(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/28 10:53 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jitesh Dudani to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated December 4, 2024; the Origin code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 03/28 10:54 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 03/28 10:56 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 03/28 10:56 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 03/28 10:57 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jitesh Dudani. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 03/28 10:58 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jitesh Dudani. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Marco Meier. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 2:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Farrow on behalf of Marco Meier..(Farrow, Sean)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 03/27 12:56 PM
FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Google LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Marco Meier..(Dudani, Jitesh) Modified on 3/28/2025 (jgo)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 12:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Paul Madzelan on behalf of Marco Meier..(Madzelan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/27 12:34 PM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dudani, Jitesh) Modified on 3/28/2025 (jgo)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 03/27 12:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marta Martinez, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Marco Meier..(Dudani, Jitesh)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 03/27 12:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Google LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Google LLC..(Dudani, Jitesh)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/27 12:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Google LLC, Marta Martinez. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30836270)Document filed by Marco Meier..(Dudani, Jitesh)
Related: [-]