Florida Middle District Court
Judge:James S Moody, Jr
Referred: Anthony E Porcelli
Case #: 8:25-cv-00762
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 1:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Dayan Candappa
Defendant
Nancy Cooper
Defendant
Olivet University
Represented By
Yen-Yi Anderson
Anderson And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Dev Pragad


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 04/23 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Sara Tesoriero on behalf of Dayan Candappa, Nancy Cooper, Dev Pragad. Lead Counsel: Cameron Stracher. (Tesoriero, Sara)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
15 15 notice Compliance notice Fri 04/18 6:18 PM
NOTICE of compliance by Olivet University (Anderson, Yen-Yi)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 04/18 6:15 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Yen-Yi Anderson on behalf of Olivet University. Lead Counsel: Yen-Yi Anderson. (Anderson, Yen-Yi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/10 3:18 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to May 30, 2025. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/10/2025. (SMB)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Thu 04/10 2:25 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Serve Responsive Pleading by Dayan Candappa, Nancy Cooper, Dev Pragad. (Tesoriero, Sara) Modified on 4/10/2025 (SMB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/09 5:12 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Cameron Stracher may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants, Dev Pragad, Nancy Cooper, and Dayan Candappa. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 4/9/2025. (KBP)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/09 4:56 PM
MOTION for Cameron Stracher to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23227582 for $150 by Dayan Candappa, Nancy Cooper, Dev Pragad. (Stracher, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of appearance Wed 04/02 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Tesoriero on behalf of Dayan Candappa, Nancy Cooper, Dev Pragad (Tesoriero, Sara)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 03/31 9:23 AM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
7 7 service Summons issued Fri 03/28 1:29 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Dayan Candappa, Nancy Cooper, Dev Pragad. (BD)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically / Video Fri 03/28 1:11 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 3 Motion for Special Admission. Attorney Yen-Yi Anderson may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 3/28/2025. (KBP)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/28 10:15 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:25-cv-762-JSM-AEP. (RLK)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 03/28 10:06 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Yen-Yi Anderson Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RLK)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appear Telephonically / Video Fri 03/28 12:59 AM
MOTION for Ye-Yi Anderson to appear pro hac vice by Olivet University. (Anderson, Yen-Yi) Modified to edit docket text on 3/28/2025 (RLK)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 03/28 12:34 AM
NOTICE of filing civil cover sheet, proposed summons and exhibits to1 Complaint against Dayan Candappa, Nancy Cooper, Dev Pragad with Jury Demand filed by Olivet University.(Anderson, Yen-Yi) Modified to edit docket text on 3/28/2025 (RLK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Proposed Summons,
Att: 9 Proposed Summons,
Att: 10 Proposed Summons
misc Pay Fee Fri 03/28 10:54 AM
FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23180598 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Yen-Yi Anderson. (Anderson, Yen-Yi) Modified on 3/28/2025 to link to3 Motion for PHV (BD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/27 11:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Dayan Candappa, Nancy Cooper, Dev Pragad with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23179113) filed by Olivet University.(Anderson, Yen-Yi)
Related: [-]