Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Paul S Diamond
Case #: 2:25-cv-01632
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause20:1415(e)(2) Individuals with Disabilities Education Act
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 1:07 PM EDT
Defendant
E.L. et al
933 Montgomery ave #1061
Narberth, PA 19072
Plaintiff
GARNET VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT
80 Station Road
Glen Mills, PA 19342


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/03 12:04 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GARNET VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT. All Parties. (Sereni, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gabrielle C Sereni on behalf of GARNET VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT (Sereni, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/31 11:29 AM
NOTICE by GARNET VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT re1 Complaint (Attorney), Attorney Required Forms, Civil Cover Sheet with signature (Sereni, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 03/28 4:10 PM
Summons Issued as to K.L., P.L.. Forwarded To: Plaintiff's Counsel on 3/28/25 (va)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Re: Magistrate Consent Fri 03/28 2:25 PM
Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
1 1 61 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 03/28 1:11 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18178332.), filed by GARNET VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT.(Sereni, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
misc Attorney Required Forms Fri 03/28 2:14 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file CIVIL COVER SHEET in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Signature is missing. (sbt)
Related: [-]