Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00435
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Western, 2:25-cv-00232
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 5:11 PM EDT
Defendant
GREENSTONE LLC
Defendant
PFIZER INC
Defendant
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
Defendant
PRASCO LLC
Defendant
VIATRIS INC
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Plaintiff
LARITA TURNER
317 Arabella Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15210


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/09 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA ELIZABETH BALZARINI on behalf of LARITA TURNER (BALZARINI, LAURA)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
14 14 misc Docket Annotation Mon 04/07 3:05 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Per: 3:19-md-3140-MCR-HTC, ECF No.6 Pretrial Order No. 4. All attorneys seeking to appear in this MDL must file a Notice of Appearance in all individual civil cases in which the attorney is an attorney of record. Please file a Notice of Appearance. (djb)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Docket Annotation Mon 04/07 1:44 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Counsel - See 3:25-md-3140-MCR-HTC. Pursuant to6 PRETRIAL ORDER No. 4, please file the PHV motion on behalf of NOTICE ONLY party, in the Lead Case 3:25-md-3140. Re12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laura E. Balzarini. (djb)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/07 1:12 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laura E. Balzarini.( Filing fee $ 219 receipt number AFLNDC-9428224.) by LARITA TURNER. (BALZARINI, LAURA)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
11 11 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 03/28 2:16 PM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. The above-styled case has been transferred to the Northern District of Florida, and you are listed as counsel or co-counsel of record. Non-Florida Bar members must seek pro hac vice admission. For this multidistrict litigation, please consult the modified admissions requirements described in Pretrial Order No. 4 (Case No. 3:25-md-3140, ECF No. 6). re10 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. (notice mailed and emailed to Attorney, Laura Elizabeth Balzarini) (djb)
Related: [-]
10 10 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 03/28 2:12 PM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:25-cv-00232. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
9 9 transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 03/27 3:50 PM
Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Northern District of Florida. (sdp)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/27 3:45 PM
Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re4 Praecipe to Issue Summons,5 Praecipe to Issue Summons,6 Praecipe to Issue Summons,7 Praecipe to Issue Summons,3 Praecipe to Issue Summons,2 Praecipe to Issue Summons. ERROR: no praecipe attached. CORRECTION: only one praecipe needed and attach all summons to one praecipe. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
7 7 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by LARITA TURNER (Balzarini, Laura) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by LARITA TURNER (Balzarini, Laura) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by LARITA TURNER (Balzarini, Laura) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
4 4 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by LARITA TURNER (Balzarini, Laura) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by LARITA TURNER (Balzarini, Laura) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by LARITA TURNER (Balzarini, Laura) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT against PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PRASCO LLC, GREENSTONE, LLC and VIATRIS, NC. (Fee $405, Receipt #APAWDC-8707611), filed by Larita Turner. (Balzarini, Laura) Modified text on 2/19/2025 to add receipt number. (jkn) Modified text on 2/19/2025 to add defendants names. (jd) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/28/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (jd) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/28/2025.]
Related: [-]