Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Jon E Deguilio
Case #: 1:25-cv-00146
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Commencement of SSA Action Mon 04/07 11:17 AM
Notice of Commencement of Social Security Appeal action (1 Complaint) sent to the Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security Answer or Motion due 6/6/2025. Pursuant to General Order #2022-20, the briefing schedule is as follows: The plaintiff's opening brief must be filed within 42 days after the answer is filed or 42 days after entry of an order disposing of the last remaining motion under Rule 4(c) of the Supplemental Rules, whichever is later. The Commissioner's response brief must be filed 42 days after service of the opening brief. Any reply brief must be filed 14 days after service of the response brief. (ely)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/07 11:17 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis ECF5 ; WAIVES payment of the filing fee; and DIRECTS the clerk to docket a Notice of Commencement of Social Security Appeal Action. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 4/7/2025. (ely)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/31 11:09 AM
Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kimberly J Parker. (Van Gilder, Audrey)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 03/31 11:16 AM
**NEW CASE** **MOTION PENDING** Judge Jon E DeGuilio added. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/28 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Davenport Solon on behalf of Kimberly J Parker (Solon, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/28 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey M Van Gilder on behalf of Kimberly J Parker (Van Gilder, Audrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/28 5:04 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kimberly J Parker. (Van Gilder, Audrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/28 5:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Leland Dudek, filed by Kimberly J Parker.(Van Gilder, Audrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet