Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Henry Edward Autrey
Case #: 4:25-cv-00405
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Terminated:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 2:33 AM CDT
Defendant
CSM Foreclosure Trustee Corp
Defendant
DAS Acquisition Company, LLC
Defendant
US Bank
Plaintiff
Latrell Germany
1940 Hudson Road
Saint Louis, MO 63136

GPO Apr 02 2025
OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED and the filing fee is waived. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent plaintiff Latrell Germany is attempting to allow another pro se individual represent her interests in this action - Domaneik S. Hall - the Court STRIKES this litigant from the pleadings. A non-attorney litigant may not represent another pro se litigant in federal court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must show cause no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction [ECF No. 4] is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 3] is DENIED at this time. Plaintiff's failure to timely comply with this Order could result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice. (Show Cause Response due by 4/23/2025.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/2/2025. (HMA)

Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
11 11 order Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case) Tue 04/15 4:10 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/15/2025. (JEB)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Opinion Memorandum Tue 04/15 4:08 PM
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(h)(3) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's request for the ability to use Domaneik S. Hall as her pro se counsel [ECF No.6 ] is DENIED. A separate Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/15/2025. (JEB)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Tue 04/15 1:43 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL re7 Response to Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Latrell Germany. (JEB)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 04/15 4:10 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10, 11. Copy sent to non-electronic party on this date. Tue Apr 15 16:10:50 CDT 2025 (JEB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
8 8 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Tue 04/08 12:36 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL re7 Response to Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Latrell Germany. (JEB)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 04/07 4:01 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Latrell Germany.(JEB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
6 6 motion Substitute Attorney/Law Firm Mon 04/07 4:00 PM
MOTION to Substitute Counsel by Plaintiff Latrell Germany. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
5 5 10 pgs order Memorandum & Order Wed 04/02 3:06 PM
OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No.2 ] is GRANTED and the filing fee is waived. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent plaintiff Latrell Germany is attempting to allow another pro se individual represent her interests in this action - Domaneik S. Hall - the Court STRIKES this litigant from the pleadings. A non-attorney litigant may not represent another pro se litigant in federal court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must show cause no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction [ECF No.4 ] is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No.3 ] is DENIED at this time. Plaintiff's failure to timely comply with this Order could result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice. (Show Cause Response due by 4/23/2025.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/2/2025. (HMA)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 04/02 3:07 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. copy sent to non-electronic party this date. Wed Apr 2 15:07:02 CDT 2025 (HMA)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
4 4 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 03/28 3:59 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Latrell Germany. (JWD)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Notification Fri 03/28 4:15 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry Edward Autrey. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]
misc Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY) Fri 03/28 4:16 PM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
Related: [-]
misc Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY) Fri 03/28 5:01 PM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 03/28 2:50 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Latrell Germany. (JWD)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/28 2:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Latrell Germany. (JWD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/28 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant CSM Foreclosure Trustee Corp, DAS Acquisition Company, LLC, US Bank, Jury Demand, filed by Latrell Germany.(JWD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Exhibits - POA documents,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Original Filing Form