Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Melissa Damian
Case #: 1:25-cv-21492
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1333 Admiralty
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 4:08 PM EDT
Defendant
CARNIVAL CORPORATION
Plaintiff
Amaya Cushenberry
Represented By
Debie Chalik
Chalik & Chalik PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 04/11 10:53 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Amaya Cushenberry. CARNIVAL CORPORATION served on 4/4/2025, response/answer due 4/25/2025. (Chalik, Debie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 03/31 4:07 PM
Summons Issued as to CARNIVAL CORPORATION. (cwc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 03/31 4:04 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Melissa Damian. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ellen F. D'Angelo is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/31 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT against CARNIVAL CORPORATION. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18327400, filed by Amaya Cushenberry.(Chalik, Debie) Text Modified on 3/31/2025 (cwc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) Summons