Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:25-bk-50692
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
JAG Public Safety LLC
PO Box 100776
San Antonio, TX 78201-8776
Represented By
Robert Chamless Lane
The Lane Law Firm PLLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
47 47 order BK-Dismissing Document (pdf) Fri 04/11 10:28 AM
Order Dismissing Motion as Moot Related [+] (Order entered on 4/11/2025) (Hardage, Bridget)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Approval of Post-Petition Monthly Retainer Payments (WITH 21 Day Objection Language) filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025 .
46 46 motion ~Motion (Generic) Fri 04/11 7:07 AM
Amended Motion FOR APPROVAL OF POST-PETITION MONTHLY RETAINER PAYMENTS (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC(Lane, Robert) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Approval of Post-Petition Monthly Retainer Payments (WITH 21 Day Objection Language) filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025.
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 10, 2025
45 45 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/10 7:30 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Lane, Robert) Related [+]
Related: [-] 43 Interim Order Regarding (related document(s):2 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Budget #(2) Exhibit B - UCC Lien List #(3) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025.) (Order entered on 4/9/2025)
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
44 44 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/09 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 38 Order Regarding (related document(s):6 Motion for Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Wages in the Ordinary course of Business filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Wage Summary #(2) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025 .) (Order entered on 4/7/2025)
43 43 8 pgs order Use of Cash Collateral (pdf) Wed 04/09 1:21 PM
Interim Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 4/9/2025) (Hardage, Bridget)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Budget #(2) Exhibit B - UCC Lien List #(3) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025 .
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
42 42 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 04/08 5:17 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Reagan H. "Tres" Gibbs IIIfor Creditor Mobilease, Inc.. (Gibbs, Reagan)
Related: [-]
41 41 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 04/08 5:12 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Emma Myles for Creditor Mobilease, Inc.. (Myles, Emma)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 04/08 9:56 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Christopher S. Murphy for Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts, Revenue Accounting Division. (Murphy, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
40 40 court Exhibit Index and Witness List (court) Tue 04/08 3:19 PM
Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing on April 7, 2025 Related [+] (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Budget #(2) Exhibit B - UCC Lien List #(3) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025 .,6 Motion for Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Wages in the Ordinary course of Business filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Wage Summary #(2) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025 .,11 Motion to Pay Critical Vendors filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A #(2) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025 .
38 38 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Mon 04/07 1:16 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 4/7/2025) (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Wages in the Ordinary course of Business filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Wage Summary #(2) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025 .
37 37 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Mon 04/07 12:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Sylvester Anthony Mauro for Creditor c/o Syl Mauro, Atty River City Federal Credit Union. (Mauro, Sylvester)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc ~Document Mon 04/07 7:08 AM
Statement of Operations filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc ~Document Mon 04/07 7:08 AM
Cash Flow Statement filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc ~Document Mon 04/07 7:07 AM
Balance Sheet filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) Mon 04/07 12:01 PM
FINAL Hearing RESET Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. Hearing Scheduled For 4/30/2025 at 9:30 AM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***SET IN OPEN COURT FROM 4/7/2025 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***.
court Hearing Held Tue 04/08 7:53 AM
Hearing Held: Granted on Interim Basis-Order to come from Josua Gordon . Related [+] Order due by 4/21/2025 (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Budget #(2) Exhibit B - UCC Lien List #(3) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025 .
court Hearing Held Tue 04/08 7:54 AM
Hearing Held: Approved-Order Signed . Related [+] (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Wages in the Ordinary course of Business filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Wage Summary #(2) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025 .
court Hearing Held Tue 04/08 7:56 AM
Hearing Held: Approved-Order to come from Joshua Gordon . Related [+] Order due by 4/21/2025 (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Pay Critical Vendors filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A #(2) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025 .
Friday, April 04, 2025
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/04 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order for Status Hearing (Related Document1 ) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Subchapter V filed By JAG Public Safety LLC. Status Hearing set for 5/21/2025 at 9:30 AM at SA Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/2/2025)
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/04 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 22 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. ) (Related Document(s):8 Application to Employ Debtor's Attorney The Lane Law Firm, PLLC. filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. Hearing Scheduled For 4/23/2025 at 9:30 AM at SA Courtroom 1. ) Notice Date 04/04/2025. (Admin.
31 31 motion ~Motion (Generic) Fri 04/04 2:28 PM
Motion FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING DEBTOR TO CONTINUE USING PRE-PETITION BANK ACCOUNTS (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC(Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 03, 2025
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/03 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order Regarding (related document(s):14 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) (Related Document(s):11 Motion TO PAY CRITICAL VENDORS filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order))) (Order entered on 4/1/2025)
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/03 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Regarding (related document(s):7 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) (Related Document(s):6 Motion FOR AUTHORIZATION TO PAY PRE-PETITION WAGES IN THE ORDINARY COURSE OF BUSINESS filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Wage Summary # 2 Proposed Order))) (Order entered on 4/1/2025)
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/03 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 12 Order Regarding (related document(s):3 Motion for Expedited Hearing filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration #(2) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) (Related Document(s):2 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Budget #2 Exhibit B - UCC Lien List #3 Proposed Order). Modified on 4/1/2025 .) (Order entered on 4/1/2025)) Notice Date 04/03/2025. (Admin.
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/03 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 341 Meeting of Creditors Subchapter V of Chapter 11 (F) Set For 5/6/2025 at 01:00 PM via Via Phone: (866)909-2905; Code: 5519921#; Objections to Dischargeability due by 7/7/2025- Proofs of Claim Due 6/9/2025
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
26 26 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Wed 04/02 11:36 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Karalyssa C Casillas for Creditor Bexar County. (Casillas, Karalyssa)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc ~Document Wed 04/02 10:37 AM
Supplemental Affdavit filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Lane, Robert) Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Application to Employ Debtor's Attorney The Lane Law Firm, PLLC (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Declaration # 3 Engagement Letter # 4 Proposed Order)
24 24 misc ~Document Wed 04/02 8:13 AM
Witness & Exhibit List filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC.(Lane, Robert) Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Budget #(2) Exhibit B - UCC Lien List #(3) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025.,6 Motion for Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Wages in the Ordinary course of Business filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Wage Summary #(2) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025.,11 Motion to Pay Critical Vendors filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A #(2) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Budget
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
Att: 11 Exhibit 11
Att: 12 Exhibit 12
23 23 order BK-Status Hearing Ch 11 Sub V (F) Wed 04/02 5:49 AM
Order for Status Hearing Related [+] Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Subchapter V filed By JAG Public Safety LLC. Status Hearing set for 5/21/2025 at 9:30 AM at SA Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/2/2025) (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-] ument1
22 22 court Hearing (F) Wed 04/02 5:46 AM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. ) Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Application to Employ Debtor's Attorney The Lane Law Firm, PLLC. filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. Hearing Scheduled For 4/23/2025 at 9:30 AM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
21 21 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document) Tue 04/01 4:27 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-] stricted Document19 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors List, Schedules, Statements, and Summary, Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 04/8/2025 -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 04/8/2025
20 20 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document) Tue 04/01 4:26 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-] stricted Document1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Subchapter V Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, With Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By JAG Public Safety LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 04/7/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 06/30/2025.
19 19 62 pgs misc 10 or 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors|Schedules, Statements, and Summary|Statement of Financial Affairs Tue 04/01 4:25 PM
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors List, Schedules, Statements, and Summary, Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 04/8/2025 -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 04/8/2025 (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
18 18 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Tue 04/01 3:50 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 4/1/2025) (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) (Related Document(s):11 Motion TO PAY CRITICAL VENDORS filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order))
17 17 court 341 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Subchapter V (F) Tue 04/01 3:29 PM
341 Meeting of Creditors Subchapter V of Chapter 11 (F) Set For 5/6/2025 at 01:00 PM via Via Phone: (866)909-2905; Code: 5519921#; Objections to Dischargeability due by 7/7/2025- Proofs of Claim Due 6/9/2025 (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-]
16 16 trustee UST Notice Appointing Subchapter V of Chapter 11 Trustee Tue 04/01 2:40 PM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee, Michael James O'Connor added to the case, 341 meeting to be held: telephonic May 6, 2025 at 1:00 p.m. CST (Telephone (866) 909-2905, Passcode 5519921#)(Flannery, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Statement
Att: 2 Service List
15 15 misc Notice of Hearing Tue 04/01 1:31 PM
First Amended Notice of Hearing filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Lane, Robert) Related [+]
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Hearing filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Lane, Robert) (Related Document(s):2 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Budget #(2) Exhibit B - UCC Lien List #(3) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025.,6 Motion for Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Wages in the Ordinary course of Business filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Wage Summary #(2) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025.)
14 14 motion Expedite Hearing Tue 04/01 12:56 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC(Lane, Robert) Related [+]
Related: [-] 11 Motion TO PAY CRITICAL VENDORS filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order)
Att: 1 Declaration
Att: 2 Proposed Order
13 13 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Tue 04/01 12:53 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 4/1/2025) (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) (Related Document(s):6 Motion FOR AUTHORIZATION TO PAY PRE-PETITION WAGES IN THE ORDINARY COURSE OF BUSINESS filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Wage Summary # 2 Proposed Order))
12 12 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Tue 04/01 12:53 PM
Order Regarding Related [+]
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Expedited Hearing filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration #(2) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) (Related Document(s):2 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Budget #2 Exhibit B - UCC Lien List #3 Proposed Order). Modified on 4/1/2025 .) (Order entered on 4/1/2025) (McGee, Maxine
11 11 motion ~Motion (Generic) Tue 04/01 12:52 PM
Motion TO PAY CRITICAL VENDORS filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC(Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
10 10 misc Notice of Hearing Tue 04/01 11:48 AM
Notice of Hearing filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Lane, Robert) Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Budget #(2) Exhibit B - UCC Lien List #(3) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025.,6 Motion for Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Wages in the Ordinary course of Business filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Wage Summary #(2) Proposed Order)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 4/1/2025.
9 9 motion ~Motion (Generic) Tue 04/01 9:35 AM
Motion FOR APPROVAL OF POST-PETITION MONTHLY RETAINER PAYMENTS (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC(Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 9 pgs motion Employ Tue 04/01 9:32 AM
Application to Employ Debtor's Attorney The Lane Law Firm, PLLC (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC(Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Declaration
Att: 3 Engagement Letter
Att: 4 Proposed Order
7 7 motion Expedite Hearing Tue 04/01 8:59 AM
Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC(Lane, Robert) Related [+]
Related: [-] 6 Motion FOR AUTHORIZATION TO PAY PRE-PETITION WAGES IN THE ORDINARY COURSE OF BUSINESS filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Wage Summary # 2 Proposed Order)
Att: 1 Declaration
Att: 2 Proposed Order
6 6 motion ~Motion (Generic) Tue 04/01 8:58 AM
Motion FOR AUTHORIZATION TO PAY PRE-PETITION WAGES IN THE ORDINARY COURSE OF BUSINESS filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC(Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Wage Summary
Att: 2 Proposed Order
5 5 misc ~Document Tue 04/01 8:20 AM
List of Equity Security Holders filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Debtor's Federal Tax Information Tue 04/01 8:19 AM
Debtor's Federal Income Tax Information for the Year for 2023 filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Expedite Hearing Tue 04/01 6:56 AM
Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC(Lane, Robert) Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Budget # 2 Exhibit B - UCC Lien List # 3 Proposed Order)
Att: 1 Declaration
Att: 2 Proposed Order
2 2 7 pgs motion Use Cash Collateral Tue 04/01 6:54 AM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC(Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Budget
Att: 2 Exhibit B - UCC Lien List
Att: 3 Proposed Order
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Tue 04/01 7:40 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Filed by UST Jeremy Shane Flannery (Flannery, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
court Hearing (NO FORM) Tue 04/01 11:28 AM
EXPEDITED Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following : ( IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. ) Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. AND 6 Motion for Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Wages in the Ordinary course of Business filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. Hearing Scheduled For 4/7/2025 at 10:00 AM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***SET ON EXPEDITED BASIS - MR. LANE SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
court Hearing (NO FORM) Tue 04/01 1:26 PM
EXPEDITED Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following : ( IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. ) Related [+]
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Pay Critical Vendors filed by Robert Chamless Lane for Debtor JAG Public Safety LLC. Hearing Scheduled For 4/7/2025 at 10:00 AM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***SET ON EXPEDITED BASIS - MR. LANE SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
Monday, March 31, 2025
1 1 11 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Mon 03/31 5:21 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Subchapter V With Schedules, With Statement of Financial Affairs, With Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By JAG Public Safety LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 04/7/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 06/30/2025. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Mon 03/31 5:22 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 25-50692 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00), Amount $1738.00, Receipt A25238137 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1