Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig A Gargotta
Case #: 5:25-bk-50704
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Omraadhi LLC
2755 N Interstate 35
San Antonio, TX 78208-1850
Represented By
Joyce W. Lindauer
Joyce W. Lindauer Attorney, PLLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) Tue 04/15 1:39 PM
FINAL HEARING SET Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC Hearing Scheduled For 4/28/2025 at 10:00 AM at SA Courtroom 3 ***FINAL HEARING SET IN OPEN COURT ON 4/14/25 - NFN*** (Flores, Roxanne
Monday, April 14, 2025
18 18 motion Extend Time Mon 04/14 5:36 PM
Motion to Extend Time File Schedules and Other Required Documents filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC(Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
court Hearing Held Tue 04/15 9:02 AM
Hearing Held: *** INTERIM ORDER GRANTED - TO COME FROM JOYCE LINDAUER ***. Related [+] Order due by 4/28/2025 (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-] 8 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC
Friday, April 11, 2025
17 17 answer Objection Fri 04/11 8:26 PM
Objection Filed by Grant Michael Gaines for Creditor PREM II LLC (Gaines, Grant) Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC
16 16 motion Employ Fri 04/11 2:22 PM
Application to Employ Attorney, Joyce W. Lindauer Attorney, PLLC (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC(Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 10, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/10 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 7 Order for Status Hearing (related document(s):1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Subchapter V Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation Status Hearing Set For 5/19/2025 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number:669-254-5252 ID: 160 8446 6872 (Order entered on 4/8/2025)) Notice Date 04/10/2025. (Admin.
14 14 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Thu 04/10 6:03 PM
Order Granting Related [+] (Order entered on 4/10/2025) (Luna, Emilio)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC (Related Document(s):8 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC)
13 13 misc Exhibit Index and Witness List Thu 04/10 3:42 PM
Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing on April 14, 2025 filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC.(Lindauer, Joyce) Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
12 12 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Thu 04/10 2:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Karalyssa C Casillas for Creditor Bexar County. (Casillas, Karalyssa)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Notice of Hearing Thu 04/10 2:41 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC. (Lindauer, Joyce) Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC
10 10 motion Expedite Hearing Thu 04/10 11:00 AM
Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC(Lindauer, Joyce) Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Thu 04/10 9:06 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Grant Michael Gaines for Creditor PREM II LLC. (Gaines, Grant)
Related: [-]
court Hearing (NO FORM) Thu 04/10 1:30 PM
EXPEDITED Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following : Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC Hearing Scheduled For 4/14/2025 at 08:30 AM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number:669-254-5252 ID: 160 8446 6872 ***JOYCE LINDAUER IS RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE OF HEARING*** (Flores, Roxanne
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
8 8 motion Use Cash Collateral Wed 04/09 5:18 PM
Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC (Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 order BK-Status Hearing Ch 11 Sub V (F) Tue 04/08 2:38 PM
Order for Status Hearing Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Subchapter V Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation Status Hearing Set For 5/19/2025 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number:669-254-5252 ID: 160 8446 6872 (Order entered on 4/8/2025) (Mujica, Roxanne
Saturday, April 05, 2025
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/05 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/05/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 341 Meeting of Creditors Subchapter V of Chapter 11 (F) Set For 5/1/2025 at 10:00 AM via Via Phone: (866)909-2905; Code: 5519921#; Objections to Dischargeability due by 6/30/2025- Proofs of Claim Due 6/9/2025
Thursday, April 03, 2025
5 5 court 341 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Subchapter V (F) Thu 04/03 9:44 AM
341 Meeting of Creditors Subchapter V of Chapter 11 (F) Set For 5/1/2025 at 10:00 AM via Via Phone: (866)909-2905; Code: 5519921#; Objections to Dischargeability due by 6/30/2025- Proofs of Claim Due 6/9/2025 (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-]
4 4 trustee UST Notice Appointing Subchapter V of Chapter 11 Trustee Thu 04/03 9:04 AM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee, Eric Terry added to the case, 341 meeting to be held: May 1, 2025 @ 10:00 A.M.(Rose, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 misc 10 or 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Tue 04/01 5:16 PM
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors List filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC. (Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Tue 04/01 9:23 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Filed by UST James W Rose Jr (Rose, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
2 2 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document) Mon 03/31 7:23 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Omraadhi LLC. (Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-] stricted Document1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Subchapter V Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By Omraadhi LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 04/7/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 06/30/2025.
1 1 22 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Mon 03/31 7:00 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Subchapter V Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By Omraadhi LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 04/7/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 06/30/2025. (Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-]
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Mon 03/31 7:24 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 25-50704 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00), Amount $1738.00, Receipt A25238469 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1