Saiprasad LLC
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig A Gargotta |
Case #: | 5:25-bk-50705 |
Case Filed: | Mar 31, 2025 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Saiprasad LLC
2755 N Interstate 35
San Antonio, TX 78208-1850 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
court
Hearing Continued (NO FORM)
Tue 04/15 1:41 PM
FINAL HEARING SET |
||
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Other Required Documents filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Saiprasad LLC(Lindauer, Joyce) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 04/15 9:00 AM
Hearing Held: ***INTERIM ORDER GRANTED - TO COME FROM JOYCE LINDAUER; FINAL HEARING SET FOR 4/28/25 @ 10:00 AM - LIVE NFN***. Order due by 4/28/2025 (Sosa, Alma) |
||
Friday, April 11, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Objection Filed by Grant Michael Gaines for Creditor SHIVPREM LLC (Gaines, Grant) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Application to Employ Attorney, Joyce W. Lindauer Attorney, PLLC (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Saiprasad LLC(Lindauer, Joyce) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing |
|
14 | 14
![]() Order Granting (Order entered on 4/10/2025) (Luna, Emilio) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing on April 14, 2025 filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Saiprasad LLC.(Lindauer, Joyce) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Karalyssa C Casillas for Creditor Bexar County. (Casillas, Karalyssa) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Hearing filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Saiprasad LLC. (Lindauer, Joyce) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Saiprasad LLC(Lindauer, Joyce) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Grant Michael Gaines for Creditor SHIVPREM LLC. (Gaines, Grant) |
|
court
Hearing (NO FORM)
Thu 04/10 1:29 PM
EXPEDITED Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following : |
||
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Saiprasad LLC (Lindauer, Joyce) |
|
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order for Status Hearing |
|
Saturday, April 05, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/05/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() 341 Meeting of Creditors Subchapter V of Chapter 11 (F) Set For 5/1/2025 at 11:00 AM via Via Phone: (866)909-2905; Code: 5519921#; Objections to Dischargeability due by 6/30/2025- Proofs of Claim Due 6/9/2025 (Boyd, Laurie) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Appointment of Trustee, Eric Terry added to the case, 341 meeting to be held: May 1, 2025 @ 11:00 A.M.(Rose, James) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors List filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Saiprasad LLC. (Lindauer, Joyce) |
|
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF)
Tue 04/01 9:23 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Filed by UST James W Rose Jr (Rose, James) |
||
Monday, March 31, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Declaration for Electronic Filing filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Saiprasad LLC. (Lindauer, Joyce) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Subchapter V Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By Saiprasad LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 04/7/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 06/30/2025. (Lindauer, Joyce) |
|
crditcrd
ICC-Fee Paid
Mon 03/31 7:24 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 25-50705 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00), Amount $1738.00, Receipt A25238469 (U.S. Treasury) |