California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 2:25-cv-02718
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Terminated:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 1:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Elwood Lui
Plaintiff
Peter Kleidman
680 East Main Street Suite 506
Stamford, CT 06901


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
10 10 judgmentCV Judgment Tue 04/15 10:27 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson, Related to: Order Summarily Dismissing Action Without Prejudice9 . IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (et)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Dismissing Case Tue 04/15 10:25 AM
ORDER SUMMARILY DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Percy Anderson: re Complaint - Related [+]1 . IT HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice and Judgment shall be entered accordingly. (et)
Related: [-] ferred
Friday, April 11, 2025
8 8 misc Response Fri 04/11 7:16 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Peter Kleidmanto Order on Motion for Order,,7 (Kleidman, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
7 7 order For Order Thu 04/03 2:43 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed by filing a written response within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order setting forth any valid legal and/or factual reasons or arguments why the Court should not find that it lacks subject matter jurisdiction over this action. In addition, Plaintiff is ORDERED to take no action to serve Justice Lui pending further order of the Court. If Justice Lui has already been served, Justice Lui's time to respond to the Complaint is stayed pending further order from the Court. (see document for details) (aro)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
6 6 order Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O Mon 03/31 2:47 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: Granting3 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (aro)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Mon 03/31 9:33 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 03/31 9:32 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - Related [+]1 as to Defendant Elwood Lui. (sh)
Related: [-] ferred
3 3 motion Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 Mon 03/31 9:31 AM
APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Peter Kleidman. (sh)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/31 9:30 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Peter Kleidman, (sh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Referred) Mon 03/31 9:29 AM
COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Elwood Lui Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early.(Filing fee$405 FEE PAID), filed by Plaintiff Peter Kleidman. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet