Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:J Campbell Barker
Referred: John D Love
Case #: 4:25-cv-00332
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Case in other court:429th District Court of Collin County, Texas, 429-01954-2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 12:10 PM CDT
Defendant
Matthew Boyle
Represented By
D. Randall Montgomery
D. Randall Montgomery & Associates, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant
Tara Brooks
Represented By
D. Randall Montgomery
D. Randall Montgomery & Associates, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacob White


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/14 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Jacob White (CLC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
9 9 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 04/10 11:58 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The court RECOMMENDS that Defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) (Doc. No.5 ) be GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART and that that this case be TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division, for all future proceedings Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/10/2025. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
8 8 respm Response to Motion Tue 04/08 9:05 AM
RESPONSE re6 MOTION to Remand filed by Matthew Boyle, Tara Brooks . (Montgomery, D.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/02 3:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(3) filed by Jacob White . (xl)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Remand Wed 04/02 3:00 PM
Plaintiff's Motion to Remand State Law Claims to State Court by Jacob White. (xl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
5 5 motion Dismiss Tue 04/01 4:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(3) by Matthew Boyle, Tara Brooks.(Montgomery, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
4 4 cmp Complaint Tue 04/01 2:39 PM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jacob White.(rpc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
3 3 13 pgs order Order Regulating Practice Tue 04/01 2:36 PM
ORDER Regulating Practice. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 4/1/2025. (rpc)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/01 2:30 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge J. Campbell Barker and Referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Referral
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 04/01 12:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tara Brooks, Matthew Boyle from 429th District Court of Collin County, Texas, case number 429-01954-2025. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10758952), filed by Tara Brooks, Matthew Boyle.(Montgomery, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Supplement
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Tue 04/01 2:34 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . ** Consent form mailed to Plaintiff. (rpc)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 04/01 2:37 PM
Note: Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (rpc)
Related: [-]