Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:25-bk-10474
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Kelley Corporation
PO Box 341051
Austin, TX 78734-0018
Represented By
Frank B. Lyon
Frank B. Lyon, Attorney
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 24 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
11 11 motion ~Motion (Generic) Wed 04/09 7:27 PM
Motion of Subchapter V Trustee for Post-Petition Security Deposit (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Todd Headden for Trustee Todd Headden(Headden, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 04/08 12:02 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Branch M. Sheppard for Creditor VFS US, LLC. (Sheppard, Branch)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 06, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/06 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 341 Meeting of Creditors Subchapter V of Chapter 11 (F) Set For 4/28/2025 at 11:00 AM via Via Phone: (866)711-2282; Code: 3544189#; Objections to Dischargeability due by 6/27/2025- Proofs of Claim Due 6/10/2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/06 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Status Hearing Set For 5/27/2025 at 01:00 PM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/bradley.txwb via Zoom or Meeting ID: 160 1114 1085
Friday, April 04, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/04 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Reassigning Case. Shad Robinson terminated from the case, Judge Christopher G Bradley assigned to case. (Order entered on 4/2/2025)
6 6 order BK-Status Hearing Ch 11 Sub V (F) Fri 04/04 12:13 PM
Related: [-]
5 5 court 341 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Subchapter V (F) Fri 04/04 10:54 AM
341 Meeting of Creditors Subchapter V of Chapter 11 (F) Set For 4/28/2025 at 11:00 AM via Via Phone: (866)711-2282; Code: 3544189#; Objections to Dischargeability due by 6/27/2025- Proofs of Claim Due 6/10/2025 (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-]
4 4 trustee UST Notice Appointing Subchapter V of Chapter 11 Trustee Fri 04/04 10:51 AM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee, Todd Headden added to the case, 341 meeting to be held: April 28, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. via Telephone(Tobin, Shane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Statement
Att: 2 Service List
3 3 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document) Fri 04/04 10:01 AM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Frank B. Lyon for Debtor Kelley Corporation. (Lyon, Frank)
Related: [-] stricted Document1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Subchapter V Without Schedules, With Statement of Financial Affairs, With Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By Kelley Corporation. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 04/8/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 06/30/2025. (Lyon, Frank)Modified on 4/2/2025 to correct docket text.
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
2 2 order BK-Reassigning Case (PDF) Wed 04/02 11:48 AM
Order Reassigning Case. Shad Robinson terminated from the case, Judge Christopher G Bradley assigned to case. (Order entered on 4/2/2025) (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Wed 04/02 8:12 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Filed by UST Shane P. Tobin (Tobin, Shane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
1 1 90 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Tue 04/01 3:39 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Subchapter V With Schedules, With Statement of Financial Affairs, With Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By Kelley Corporation. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 04/8/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 06/30/2025. (Lyon, Frank)
Related: [-]
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Tue 04/01 3:47 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 25-10474 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00), Amount $1738.00, Receipt A25242391 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1