North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Louise Wood Flanagan
Case #: 7:25-cv-00578
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 5:13 PM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Interested Party
Torts Branch USDOJ
Plaintiff
Tiffany Thurston
Represented By
Kevin Donovan
Rubenstein Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Special Appearance Tue 04/08 10:55 AM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Miriam Agrait on behalf of Tiffany Thurston. (Agrait, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Mon 04/07 12:39 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit filed by Tiffany Thurston. (Donovan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Receipt of Payment
order Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/07 4:18 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Miriam Fresco Agrait must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/7/2025. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/01 2:39 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Donovan on behalf of Tiffany Thurston. (Donovan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/01 2:24 PM
SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-8048878.), filed by Tiffany Thurston. (Donovan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
service Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case Tue 04/01 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]