New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:25-bk-10632
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025

Debtor
Fortuna Auction LLC
14611 Southern Blvd. Suite 272
Wellington, FL 33470
Represented By
Tracy L. Klestadt
Klestadt Winters Jureller Southard & Ste
contact info
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 6:26 PM EDT
Creditor
Gina Lommerin
Interested Party
Overton Funding, LLC
Represented By
Shanna M. Kaminski
Kaminski Law, PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
Parkside Funding Group, LLC
Represented By
Shanna M. Kaminski
Kaminski Law, PLLC
contact info
Trustee
Yann Geron
Yann Geron Geron Legal Advisors LLC 370 Lexington Avenue Suite 1208
New York, NY 10017
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Annie Wells
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
30 30 5 pgs motion Application, Employ Mon 04/28 5:45 PM
Application to Employ Schulman Lobel LLP as Accountants to the Debtor filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Norman Schulman
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
29 29 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 04/22 2:09 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-] 16
Monday, April 21, 2025
28 28 notice Notice, Change of Address of Debtor/Creditor Mon 04/21 2:45 PM
Notice of Change of Address of Creditor filed by Gina Lommerin. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
27 27 4 pgs order Order RE: Application, Employ Mon 04/21 1:47 PM
Order, Signed on 4/21/2025, Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Klestadt Winters Jureller Southard & Stevens, LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor and Debtor-in-Possession, Effective as of April 1, 2025 Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 24
26 26 order Motion, Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Mon 04/21 10:54 AM
Order, Signed on 4/21/2025, Establishing Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof Related [+]. Proofs of Claim due by 5/30/2025, Governmental Proofs of Claim due by 9/29/2025. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, April 17, 2025
25 25 ans Statement Thu 04/17 1:27 PM
Statement Debtor's Standard Form of Consignment Agreement (Prepetition) filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
24 24 26 pgs motion Application, Employ Mon 04/14 5:51 PM
Application to Employ Klestadt Winters Jureller Southard & Stevens, LLP as Counsel to Debtor filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice, Hearing Mon 04/14 10:03 AM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Initial Case Conference filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. with hearing to be held on 4/14/2025 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 13, 2025
22 22 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Mon 04/14 12:08 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 04/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #21 )
Friday, April 11, 2025
21 21 order Scheduling Order (Will Generate PDF Notice to BNC) Fri 04/11 10:32 AM
Case Management Order, Signed on 4/11/2025, Regarding Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Scheduling Case Conference, and Setting Deadlines for Filing Plan. Conference to be held on 6/4/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG). (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
20 20 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 04/09 10:40 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-] 16
19 19 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Wed 04/09 4:35 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Schedule 21 to Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
18 18 notice Notice, Meeting of Creditors Wed 04/09 12:00 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors with Telephonic Dial-in Instructions Related [+] filed by Annie Wells on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/30/2025 at 02:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Wells, Annie)
Related: [-] 10
17 17 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Tue 04/08 10:24 PM
Notice of Presentment Related [+] filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. with presentment to be held on 4/17/2025 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 523 (MG) Objections due by 4/14/2025, (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 9 pgs motion Motion, Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Tue 04/08 10:19 PM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Proposed Notice
15 15 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Tue 04/08 10:01 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Schedules Tue 04/08 10:00 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Sat 04/05 12:09 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 04/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #10 )
Thursday, April 03, 2025
12 12 notice Notice, Appearance Thu 04/03 3:01 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Shanna M. Kaminski on behalf of Parkside Funding Group, LLC. (Kaminski, Shanna)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice, Appearance Thu 04/03 2:56 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Shanna M. Kaminski on behalf of Overton Funding, LLC. (Kaminski, Shanna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
10 10 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11) (BNC) Wed 04/02 3:43 PM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/30/2025 at 02:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 Wed 04/02 3:20 PM
Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs trustee Notice, Appointment of Trustee in a Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case Wed 04/02 12:38 PM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee in a Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case Appointing Yann Geron, Esq. as Subchapter V Trustee Filed by Annie Wells on behalf of United States Trustee.(Wells, Annie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit I - Subchapter V Trustee's Verified Statement
7 7 misc Small Business Statement of Operations Wed 04/02 10:27 AM
Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Cash Flow Statement Wed 04/02 10:25 AM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs misc Balance Sheet Wed 04/02 10:25 AM
Balance Sheet Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]
misc Set Deficiency Deadlines Wed 04/02 7:44 AM
Deficiencies Set: Schedule A/B due 4/15/2025. Schedule D due 4/15/2025. Schedule E/F due 4/15/2025. Schedule G due 4/15/2025. Schedule H due 4/15/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 4/15/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/15/2025. Atty Disclosure State. due 4/15/2025. Statement of Operations DUE at Time of Filing. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors DUE at Time of Filing. Balance Sheet DUE at Time of Filing. Cash Flow Statement DUE at Time of Filing. Declaration of Schedules due 4/15/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/15/2025. Resolution or Other Statement Authorizing Filing Pursuant to LR 1074-1 DUE at Time of Filing. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit DUE at Time of Filing. Incomplete Filings due by 4/15/2025, (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Wed 04/02 7:53 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. Related [+] (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-] solution or Other Statement Authorizing Filing Pursuant to LR 1074-1
misc Add Judge Wed 04/02 7:58 AM
Judge Martin Glenn added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
4 4 misc Tax Information (Corporation or Partnership) Tue 04/01 10:20 PM
Tax Information (Corporation or Partnership) for the Year of 2023 Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Tax Information (Corporation or Partnership) Tue 04/01 10:19 PM
Tax Information (Corporation or Partnership) for the Year of 2022 Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Tax Information (Corporation or Partnership) Tue 04/01 10:18 PM
Tax Information (Corporation or Partnership) for the Year of 2021 Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/01 9:20 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 06/30/2025. Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Status Conference To Be Held Before 06/2/2025. Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt of Klestadt Winters Jureller Southard & Ste on behalf of Fortuna Auction LLC. (Klestadt, Tracy)
Related: [-]