New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert M Levy
Case #: 1:25-cv-01812
Nature of Suit330 Torts - Personal Injury - Federal Employers’ Liability
Cause45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 12:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Long Island Rail Road Company
Plaintiff
Al-Hakim Bey
Represented By
Valerie J. Lauriello
Flynn & Lauriello PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/14 8:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Al-Hakim Bey. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 4/11/2025, answer due 5/2/2025. (Lauriello, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/02 1:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (KD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 04/02 1:43 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Wed 04/02 1:43 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (KD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/02 12:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18913683 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Al-Hakim Bey. (Lauriello, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/02 1:42 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]