New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Arlene R Lindsay
Case #: 2:25-cv-01814
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 1:11 PM EDT
Defendant
NICO CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.
50 Melrose Parkway
E. Patchogue, NY 11772
Plaintiff
VINCENT ALU, as Business Manager of GENERAL BUILDING LABORERS' LOCAL UNION NO. 66 of the LABORERS' INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH AMERICA, AFL-CIO
1600 Walt Whitman Road
Melville, NY 11747
Represented By
William Troy LaVelle
Lavelle Law & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
VINCENT ALU, as Trustee of the GENERAL BUILDING LABORERS' LOCAL 66 ANNUITY FUND
1600 Walt Whitman Road
Melville, NY 11747
Represented By
William Troy LaVelle
Lavelle Law & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
VINCENT ALU, as a Trustee of the GENERAL BUILDING LABORERS' LOCAL 66 GREATER NY LABORERS' EMPLOYER COOPERATIVE AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST FUND
1600 Walt Whitman Road
Melville, NY 11747
Represented By
William Troy LaVelle
Lavelle Law & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
VINCENT ALU, as a Trustee of the GENERAL BUILDING LABORERS' LOCAL 66 LABORERS' EMPLOYER COOPERATIVE AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST FUND
1600 Walt Whitman Road
Melville, NY 11747
Represented By
William Troy LaVelle
Lavelle Law & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
VINCENT ALU, as a Trustee of the GENERAL BUILDING LABORERS' LOCAL 66 NEW YORK STATE HEALTH AND SAFETY FUND
1600 Walt Whitman Road
Melville, NY 11747
Represented By
William Troy LaVelle
Lavelle Law & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
VINCENT ALU, as a Trustee of the GENERAL BUILDING LABORERS' LOCAL 66 PENSION FUND
1600 Walt Whitman Road
Melville, NY 11747
Represented By
William Troy LaVelle
Lavelle Law & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
VINCENT ALU, as a Trustee of the GENERAL BUILDING LABORERS' LOCAL 66 TRAINING PROGRAM
1600 Walt Whitman Road
Melville, NY 11747
Represented By
William Troy LaVelle
Lavelle Law & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
VINCENT ALU, as a Trustee of the GENERAL BUILDING LABORERS' LOCAL 66 VACATION FUND
1600 Walt Whitman Road
Melville, NY 11747
Represented By
William Troy LaVelle
Lavelle Law & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
VINCENT ALU, as a Trustee of the GENERAL BUILDING LABORERS' LOCAL 66 WELFARE FUND
1600 Walt Whitman Road
Melville, NY 11747
Represented By
William Troy LaVelle
Lavelle Law & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
6 6 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/02 4:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is scheduled for June 11, 2025 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/2/2025. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 04/02 3:40 PM
Summons Issued as to NICO Construction Group, Inc. (LJ)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Wed 04/02 3:26 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (LJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 04/02 3:23 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/02 1:57 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu (LaVelle, William) Modified on 4/2/2025 (LJ)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/02 12:40 PM
COMPLAINT WITH VERIFICATION FILED against NICO Construction Group, Inc. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18913971 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu, Vincent Alu (LaVelle, William) Modified on 4/2/2025 (LJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/02 1:34 PM
***Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. A completed Civil Cover Sheet was not filed - specifically page 2 of the document is missing. Please submit a new JS44 cover sheet available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/forms/js-44-civil-cover-sheet using the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (LJ)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/02 3:25 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]