Henderson v. Lewis
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert W Schroeder, III |
Referred: | James Boone Baxter |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-00039 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER for Initial Partial Filing Fee of $2.00 within 30 days (Motion(s)2 terminated). Signed by Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter on 4/3/2025. (slo) |
|
3 | 3
![]() ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of receipt of this order in which present a short and plain statement setting forth the Plaintiff's claims, on a standard §1983 lawsuit form. Signed by Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter on 4/3/2025. (slo) |
|
Wednesday, April 02, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (with trust fund data sheet) by Devonta Henderson.(slo) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Aaron Lewis filed by Devonta Henderson.(slo) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/02 2:02 PM
STANDING ORDER referring prisoner civl rights cases to Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/2/2025. (slo) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability
Wed 04/02 2:03 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (slo) |
||
utility
Remark
Wed 04/02 2:04 PM
Mailed Consent to Magistrate, Docket sheet and Prose guidelines, that include information regarding reporting change of address to court, to the Petitioner per Magistrate Judge (slo) |