District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:James E Boasberg
Case #: 1:25-cv-00980
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 5:08 PM EDT
Defendant
LEE ZELDIN
Plaintiff
INHANCE TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
Susan Cook
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Wed 04/09 2:50 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/7/2025. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/6/2025. (Cook, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
7 7 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Mon 04/07 1:20 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to LEE ZELDIN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/04 4:33 PM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/02 9:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Tom Boer on behalf of INHANCE TECHNOLOGIES LLC (Boer, Joel)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/02 7:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Tyler Young on behalf of INHANCE TECHNOLOGIES LLC (Young, Jacob)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/02 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marlan Golden on behalf of INHANCE TECHNOLOGIES LLC (Golden, Marlan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Related Case Wed 04/02 5:21 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by INHANCE TECHNOLOGIES LLC. Case related to Case No. 24-cv-445. (Cook, Susan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Wed 04/02 5:18 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INHANCE TECHNOLOGIES LLC (Cook, Susan)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/02 5:05 PM
COMPLAINT against LEE ZELDIN in his official capacity as Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11586127) filed by INHANCE TECHNOLOGIES LLC.(Cook, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons - Zeldin,
Att: 3 Summons Summons - Bondi,
Att: 4 Summons Summons - Martin