Freshwater v. Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc.
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Myron H Thompson |
Referred: | Stephen Michael Doyle |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-00253 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2025 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 5:04 PM CDT |
Defendant
Hyundai Power Transformers Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Bonita Freshwater
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bonita Freshwater re4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Dakroub, Jenna) |
|
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Bonita Freshwater. Corporate Disclosures due by 4/14/2025. (LAB) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (LAB) |
|
Wednesday, April 02, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/03 11:20 AM
Case Assigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Stephen Michael Doyle. (LAB) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Hyundai Power Transformers Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AALMDC-3835706.), filed by Bonita Freshwater. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 7/1/2025. (Dakroub, Jenna) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |