Nebraska District Court
Judge:Robert F Rossiter, Jr
Referred: Ryan C Carson
Case #: 8:25-cv-00245
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 5:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Ur Jaddou
Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Office of the General Counsel 2707 Martin Luther King Jr. Ave SE
Washington, DC 20528
Plaintiff
Elisa Neria Morales
1111B S Governors Avenue Suite 25136
Dover, DE 19904

GPO Apr 09 2025
ce. A defendant has 21 days or 60 days if the defendant is the United States or a United States agency, or an officer or employee of the United States described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(2) or (3) after receipt of the summons to answer or otherwise reMEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The filing fee has been paid in this case. At the direction of the Court, this case is removed from the pro se docket. The Clerk's office shall assign new judges to this case and request a reassignment order from Chief Judge Rossiter. Plaintiff's motion for summons, Filing No. 4, is granted. The Clerk of Court shall sign and issue the summons forms Plaintiff submitted in Filing No. 4 and send them to Plaintiff. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) requires service of the complaint on a defendant within 90 days of filing the complaint. However,Plaintiff is granted, on the Court's own motion, an extension of time until 90 days from the date of this order to complete service of process. The Clerk of Court shall set a case management deadline accordingly. Plaintiff is hereby notified that failure to obtain service of process on the Defendants within 90 days of the date of this order may result in dismissal of this matter without further notispond to a complaint. The parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the Local Rules of this Court. Plaintiff shall keep the Court informed of her current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
7 7 order Reassignment Order Wed 04/09 3:50 PM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Pursuant to the supervising pro se judge's order of April 9, 2025 (Filing No.5 ), this case is reassigned to Chief District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. for disposition and Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 04/09 3:03 PM
Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Ur Jaddou. Original mailed to plaintiff for completion of service. (LKO)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Memorandum and Order ~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 04/09 2:55 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The filing fee has been paid in this case. At the direction of the Court, this case is removed from the pro se docket. The Clerk's office shall assign new judges to this case and request a reassignment order from Chief Judge Rossiter. Plaintiff's motion for summons, Filing No.4 , is granted. The Clerk of Court shall sign and issue the summons forms Plaintiff submitted in Filing No.4 and send them to Plaintiff. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) requires service of the complaint on a defendant within 90 days of filing the complaint. However,Plaintiff is granted, on the Court's own motion, an extension of time until 90 days from the date of this order to complete service of process. The Clerk of Court shall set a case management deadline accordingly. Plaintiff is hereby notified that failure to obtain service of process on the Defendants within 90 days of the date of this order may result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. A defendant has 21 days or 60 days if the defendant is the United States or a United States agency, or an officer or employee of the United States described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(2) or (3) after receipt of the summons to answer or otherwise respond to a complaint. The parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the Local Rules of this Court. Plaintiff shall keep the Court informed of her current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/02 3:11 PM
MOTION for Summons on behalf of Plaintiff Elisa Neria Morales. (LKO)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs order Order - Pro Se GO 2025-01 Wed 04/02 3:09 PM
GENERAL ORDER NO. 2025-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_evt Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case) Wed 04/02 3:08 PM
NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - Pro Se Wed 04/02 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Ur Jaddou filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Elisa Neria Morales. (LKO)
Related: [-]