Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert J White
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:25-cv-10953
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 1:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Milan Area Schools
Plaintiff
Jaime Schlack
Represented By
Alysa Janell Wiggins
Nachtlaw, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Wed 04/09 1:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Milan Area Schools waiver sent on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/9/2025. (Cretcher, Grace)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Wed 04/09 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Grace Cathryn Cretcher on behalf of Jaime Schlack. (Cretcher, Grace)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Wed 04/09 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Travis M. Comstock on behalf of Milan Area Schools. (Comstock, Travis)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance Wed 04/09 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of Milan Area Schools. (Mullins, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
3 3 notice Practice Guidelines Thu 04/03 2:27 PM
Notice of District Judge Robert J. White's Case Management Requirements. (TVil)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Thu 04/03 1:46 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Milan Area Schools* (JBro)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Thu 04/03 1:45 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (JBro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 04/02 10:30 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Jaime Schlack against Milan Area Schools with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: BMIEDC-10182792 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Wiggins, Alysa)
Related: [-]