Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Carlos E Mendoza
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:25-cv-00563
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 1:07 AM EDT
Defendant
CWC,CWCL Lydia Cortez
Defendant
M C Operation Dan H.
Defendant
Lasonje Hollinger
Defendant
Mears Transportation Talent Acquistion
Defendant
CDL Trainer Luis R-B
Defendant
Alicia Reece
Plaintiff
Cindy Elaine Washington
3516 Meadow Lake Lane
Orlando, FL 32808


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
5 5 respoth Response Fri 04/11 10:35 PM
RESPONSE re3 Order filed by Cindy Elaine Washington. (MLB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
4 4 order Order Thu 04/03 12:22 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/3/2025. (ALL)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/03 12:20 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/3/2025. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/02 4:23 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Cindy Elaine Washington. (MLB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/02 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Cindy Elaine Washington.(MLB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet