California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00056
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 1:42 AM PDT
Defendant
Marco Antonio Hernandez (1)
Represented By
Karthik Raju
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Robert James Strzelecki (2)
Represented By
Gail R. Shifman
Law Offices Of Gail Shifman
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Eli Cohen
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Eli J. Cohen
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/03/2025 2:25 AM PDT
Thursday, January 30, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Marco Hernandez (1). (lsk, COURT STAFF) (lsk, COURT STAFF). [3:25-mj-70105-MAG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/30/2025) penalty sheet
3 3 Motion to seal by USA (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:25-mj-70105-MAG]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order to Seal Case as to Marco Hernandez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 1/29/2025. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:25-mj-70105-MAG]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Marco Hernandez Initial Appearance set for 1/31/2025 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. (jaf, COURT STAFF) [3:25-mj-70105-MAG]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Initial Appearance as to Marco Hernandez held on 1/31/2025; remanded to custody. The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Added attorney Karthik Raju for Marco Hernandez. Government moves to unseal just the complaint - Granted by Court. Status Conference set for 2/5/2025 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Recording Time 10:58am-11:05am. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:25-mj-70105-MAG]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER as to Marco Hernandez exclude time 1/31/2025-2/5/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 1/31/2025. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:25-mj-70105-MAG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
8 8 6 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of United States' Motion for Detention by USA as to Marco Hernandez (Cohen, Eli) [3:25-mj-70105-MAG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Status Conference as to Marco Hernandez held on 2/5/2025. Status Conference set for 3/5/2025 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Recording Time 11:10-11:11. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:25-mj-70105-MAG]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER as to Marco Hernandez excluding time 2/5/2025-3/5/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/5/2025. (lsk, COURT STAFF) [3:25-mj-70105-MAG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
14 14 INDICTMENT as to Marco Antonio Hernandez (1) count(s) 1, 2, Robert James Strzelecki (2) count(s) 1, 3, 4. (far, COURT STAFF) Modified on 3/14/2025 (lsk, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Penalty Sheet,
Att: 3 Penalty Sheet
16 16 MOTION for Sealing Order by USA. (far, COURT STAFF) Modified on 3/14/2025 (lsk, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
17 17 Order Granting re 16 Motion for Sealing Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/4/25. (far, COURT STAFF) Modified on 3/14/2025 (lsk, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]