California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:25-cv-02972
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 8:04 PM PDT
Defendant
The Regents of the University of California
Plaintiff
Tyrone Wise, II
Represented By
Jerome Clay, Jr
Law Office Of Jerome A. Clay, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 04/03 8:08 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used.All proposed summonses are required to have their own entry. The correct event can be found at Civil Events Other Filings Other Documents > Proposed Summons This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Complaint filed by Tyrone Wise, II (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 04/02 2:09 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/16/2025. (amf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/02 12:28 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Tyrone Wise, II . (Clay, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 04/03 8:29 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect Civil Cover sheet used, please use the Northern District Courts Civil Cover sheet found on our website. JS-CAND 44 Related [+] No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:1 Complaint filed by Tyrone Wise, II (amf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] v. 12/2024
Monday, March 31, 2025
1 1 184 pgs COMPLAINT against The Regents of the University of California ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20516459.). Filed by Tyrone Wise, II.(Clay, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons